Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Federico A Moreno
Referred: Ellen F D'Angelo
Case #: 1:24-cv-24653
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 5:20 AM EST
Defendant
ISSA A BADER
Individually 15597 SW 111 TERRACE
Miami, FL 33196
Represented By
Juliana Gonzalez
Mg Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
NSDI Management, Inc
15597 SW 111 TERRACE
Miami, FL 33196
Represented By
Juliana Gonzalez
Mg Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
PRISCILLA PORTUGAL
20900 NE 30th Avenue, Ste. 800
Aventura, FL 33180
Represented By
Ruben Martin Saenz
The Saenz Law Firm, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
33 33 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/06 11:28 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re31 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Priscilla Portugal. Responses due by 5/20/2025.(Saenz, Ruben)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, April 25, 2025
32 32 misc Statement Fri 04/25 7:48 PM
Statement of: of Undisputed Material Facts by NSDI Management, Inc, Issa A. Bader re31 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment(Gonzalez, Juliana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Sworn Statement of Issa Bader
31 31 motion Partial Summary Judgment Fri 04/25 7:47 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by NSDI Management, Inc, Issa A. Bader. Responses due by 5/9/2025. (Gonzalez, Juliana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Compliance Tue 04/22 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order (D.E. 29) by Priscilla Portugal re29 Order to Show Cause, (Saenz, Ruben)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
29 29 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 04/18 4:10 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF NELLY MOSCOSO AND FOR SANCTIONS re27 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Deposition of Nelly Moscoso filed by Priscilla Portugal. Show Cause Response due by 4/30/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen F. D'Angelo on 4/18/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs order Order Referring Motion Fri 04/18 11:19 AM
ORDER REFERRING27 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION to Compel Deposition of Nelly Moscoso, for Order to Show Cause, and for Sanctions. Motion referred to Judge Ellen F. D'Angelo. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/15/2025. See attached document for full details. (ms04)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
27 27 motion Compel Wed 04/09 12:18 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Deposition of Nelly Moscoso by Priscilla Portugal. Responses due by 4/23/2025.(Saenz, Ruben)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Wed 02/05 9:50 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Mediator Carlos J. Burruezo, Esq. Mediation set for 5/16/2025 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/4/2025. See attached document for full details. (ms04)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF Tue 01/28 9:55 AM
Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): CARLOS J. BURRUEZO. (Saenz, Ruben)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
24 24 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 01/27 5:22 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re23 Notice of Mediator Selection (Optional Hearing). Mediator Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the mediator. (jas)
Related: [-]
23 23 adr Notice of Mediator Selection (Optional Hearing) Mon 01/27 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Carlos J. Burruezo selected. Filed/Added by PRISCILLA PORTUGAL.(Saenz, Ruben)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Friday, January 24, 2025
22 22 respm Response/Reply (Other) Fri 01/24 5:39 PM
RESPONSE to18 Statement of Claim by NSDI Management, Inc, ISSA A BADER. (Gonzalez, Juliana)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 01/24 11:58 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot13 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/24/2025. (ms04)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
20 20 4 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Wed 01/22 10:42 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 6/11/2025. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/21/2025. See attached document for full details. (ms04)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/22 10:39 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury Trial is set for the two-week period beginning 8/11/2025 in the Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call is set for 8/5/2025 at 09:30 AM in the Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/21/2025. See attached document for full details. (ms04)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
18 18 misc Statement Fri 01/17 7:29 PM
Statement of: Claim Related [+] by PRISCILLA PORTUGAL re16 Order, (Saenz, Ruben)
Related: [-] vised
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 01/14 5:15 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by ISSA A BADER, NSDI Management, Inc. (Gonzalez, Juliana)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
16 16 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 01/10 12:56 PM
ORDER striking11 Plaintiff's Statement of Claim. Plaintiff shall file a revised statement by 1/17/2025. Defendants shall file a response by 1/24/2025. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/8/2025. See attached document for full details. (ms04)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/10 2:35 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per Order DE16 . Statement of Claim due by 1/17/2025. (drz)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
15 15 respm Response/Reply (Other) Mon 01/06 8:15 PM
RESPONSE to11 Statement of Claim by ISSA A BADER, NSDI Management, Inc. (Gonzalez, Juliana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Tue 12/31 10:24 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by PRISCILLA PORTUGAL.(Saenz, Ruben)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 12/20 4:25 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ISSA A BADER, NSDI Management, Inc. Responses due by 1/3/2025. (Gonzalez, Juliana)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 12/20 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juliana Gonzalez on behalf of ISSA A BADER, NSDI Management, Inc. Attorney Juliana Gonzalez added to party ISSA A BADER(pty:dft), Attorney Juliana Gonzalez added to party NSDI Management, Inc(pty:dft). (Gonzalez, Juliana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
11 11 misc Statement Wed 12/18 10:49 AM
Statement of: Claim by PRISCILLA PORTUGAL (Saenz, Ruben)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/18 10:44 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by PRISCILLA PORTUGAL (Saenz, Ruben)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Striking Wed 12/18 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Striking DOCKET ENTRY 7 by PRISCILLA PORTUGAL (Saenz, Ruben)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
8 8 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Wed 12/18 8:54 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Login/Signature Block Violation ; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED WITHIN 3 DAYS - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and LR 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (drz)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/17 4:41 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRISCILLA PORTUGAL (Saenz, Ruben)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 12/02 5:04 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN FLSA CASES. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (ms04)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 12/02 2:42 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by PRISCILLA PORTUGAL. ISSA A BADER served on 11/29/2024, response/answer due 12/20/2024. (Saenz, Ruben)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 12/02 2:35 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by PRISCILLA PORTUGAL. NSDI Management, Inc served on 11/29/2024, response/answer due 12/20/2024. (Saenz, Ruben)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 11/27 11:32 AM
Summons Issued as to ISSA A BADER, NSDI Management, Inc. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 11/27 11:29 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ellen F. D'Angelo is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 41 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/26 5:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18013848, filed by PRISCILLA PORTUGAL.(Saenz, Ruben)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Summons,
Att: 3 Summon(s) Summons