Oregon District Court
Judge:Stacie F Beckerman
Case #: 3:24-cv-01979
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause05:75(2) Contract - Reduction in Grade
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 3:57 AM PST
Defendant
Rene M. Christianson
Defendant
High Point Consulting Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
Represented By
Hunter Brooks Emerick
Saalfeld Griggs PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
23 23 oth_sup Declaration Wed 05/14 11:43 AM
Declaration of Brian Duman in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment . Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Emerick, Hunter)
Related: [-]
22 22 oth_sup Declaration Wed 05/14 11:42 AM
Declaration of Ned Sahin in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment . Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Emerick, Hunter)
Related: [-]
21 21 oth_sup Declaration Wed 05/14 11:41 AM
Declaration of Hunter Emerick in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment . Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Emerick, Hunter)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Default Judgment Wed 05/14 11:40 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant High Point Consulting Services LLC . Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Emerick, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
19 19 3 pgs order Order Wed 04/30 2:19 PM
ORDER OF DEFAULT. The Court finds that High Point has DEFAULTED with respect to all claims against it in this proceeding. The Court directs Graybar to submit a motion for default judgment within 14 days of the date of this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 4/30/2025 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Copy mailed to pro se defendant Rene M. Christianson on 4/30/2025.) (gw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
18 18 order 1 - Scheduling Mon 04/07 3:08 PM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that High Point's counsel must file a notice of appearance on or before April 28, 2025. If High Point fails to comply with this Order, High Point will be subject to entry of default and default judgment. See Farmer, 2023 WL 8096906, at *1 ("The [c]ourt has ensured that [an unrepresented corporate defendant] has had both the time to secure new counsel and an understanding of the consequences of the failure to secure representation.... [T]he Court therefore finds that Thar is DEFAULTED as to all claims against it in this case and that all counterclaims brought by Thar are DISMISSED. Plaintiffs are directed to submit a motion for default judgment within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order."). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 4/7/2025 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Copy mailed to pro se defendant Rene M. Christianson on 4/8/2025). (gw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/04 8:47 AM
Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to1 Complaint. Filed by Rene M. Christianson. (sb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
16 16 service Clerks Notice of Mailing Mon 03/31 3:01 PM
Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Rene M. Christianson of Order 15 . (gw)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Mon 03/31 2:55 PM
ORDER: Granting the Stipulated Motion to Amend Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF No.14 ) filed by Plaintiff and defendant Rene M. Christianson, as follows: Fact Discovery is to be completed by 7/28/2025. Dispositive Motions are due by 7/28/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/25/2025. Pretrial Order deadline is stricken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
14 14 motion Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Fri 03/28 2:54 PM
Stipulated Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Emerick, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/25 1:57 PM
Answer to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Rene M. Christianson. (sb)
Related: [-]
12 12 order 1 - Scheduling Tue 03/25 9:58 AM
ORDER. Granting the parties' request (by e-mail dated 3/25/2025) for an extension of time. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 3/26/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
11 11 order 1 - Scheduling Tue 01/28 1:56 PM
ORDER. Defendant High Point Consulting Services, LLC's Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 3/24/2025, in accord with the answer deadline for defendant Rene Christianson, who is the owner of High Point Consulting. The parties reported (by e-mail) that they are working together on document exchange and negotiations. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
10 10 oth_doc Waiver Tue 01/28 10:48 AM
Waiver of Service of Summons for Rene Christianson . Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Emerick, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Thu 12/26 1:17 PM
Affidavit of Service upon High Point Consulting Services, LLC served on 12/20/2024, answer due on 1/10/2025 Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Emerick, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 12/05 10:25 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Rene M. Christianson, High Point Consulting Services, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (gd)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Proposed Summons Thu 12/05 9:14 AM
Proposed Summons Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Emerick, Hunter)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Proposed Summons Thu 12/05 9:13 AM
Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Emerick, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
5 5 service Proposed Summons Wed 12/04 2:30 PM
Proposed Summons Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Emerick, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
4 4 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/02 4:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Emerick, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
3 3 oth_doc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 11/27 11:51 AM
Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint,1 . Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Emerick, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Tue 11/26 3:12 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 3/26/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/25/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 4/25/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gd)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/26 12:09 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9662564 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc. against High Point Consulting Services, LLC. (Emerick, Hunter)
Related: [-]