Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:David C Joseph
Referred: Carol B Whitehurst
Case #: 6:24-cv-01618
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause46:30104 Personal Injury to or Death of Seamen
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 3:43 AM CST
Defendant
Diamond Offshore L L C
Represented By
William D Lampton
The Norris Firm
contact info
Joshua A Norris
The Norris Firm
contact info
Defendant
Offshore Energy Services L L C
Defendant
Seadrill Americas Inc
Plaintiff
Stephen Meche
Represented By
Thomas R Galloway, Jr
Galloway & Jefcoat
contact info
Andrea Leigh Barient
Pendley Baudin & Coffin
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
21 21 order Scheduling Order - Joseph Mon 03/31 10:01 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 3/23/2026 at 9:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge David C Joseph. Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2026 at 3:00 PM in chambers before Judge David C Joseph. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/6/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 8/6/2025. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 9/5/2025. Discovery deadline 10/6/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2025. Daubert Motions due by 11/4/2025. Motions in Limine due by 2/2/2026. Pretrial Order due by 2/25/2026. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 2/25/2026. Trial Depositions due by 2/25/2026. Bench Books due by 3/16/2026. Real Time glossary due by 3/16/2026. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 3/31/2025. (crt,LaCombe, L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 03/28 12:55 PM
ORDER that Bench Trial set for 3/23/2026 at 9:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge David C Joseph. Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2026 at 3:00 PM in chambers before Judge David C Joseph. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue a scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/27/2025. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes Status Conference Thu 03/27 5:11 PM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/27/2025. Following discussion, the parties agreed to set trial for March 23, 2026, before Judge Joseph and a pretrial conference for March 4, 2026, at 3:00 p.m. in chambers with Judge Joseph. A separate order and scheduling order shall be issued. (crt,Taylor, L)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
18 18 order Order Allowing Rule 26 Report Mon 03/24 9:33 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, IT IS ORDERED that the report is found to be complete. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/24/2025. (crt,Coreil, H)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Jurisdictional Review Finding Mon 03/24 9:32 AM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1333. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/24/2025. (crt,Coreil, H)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
16 16 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 03/21 9:08 AM
RULE 26(f) Report by Stephen Meche, Seadrill Americas Inc, Offshore Energy Services L L C, Daimond Offshore L L C. (aty,Galloway, Thomas) Modified filers on 3/21/2025 (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 03/14 4:04 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Michael G Lemoine,Kevin Ellis for Diamond Offshore L L C, Seadrill Americas Inc. Attorney William D Lampton; Joshua A Norris; Michael Franklin Held and Arthur Raymond Kraatz terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/14/2025. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
14 14 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 03/13 1:20 PM
Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney Michael G Lemoine, Kevin C Ellis on behalf of William D. Lampton, Joshua A. Norris, Michael Held, Arthur Kraatz by Diamond Offshore L L C, Seadrill Americas Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/13/2025.(aty,Held, Michael) Modified filer & motion event on 3/13/2025 (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
13 13 order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Wed 03/05 2:37 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: A telephone scheduling conference is set for 3/27/2025 at 10:00 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. The parties shall conduct a Rule 26 conference and file a joint Rule 26(f) Report by 3/21/2025. Counsel may access the call by dialing 1-650-479-3207, access code 2315 350 5623. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/5/2025. (crt,Coreil, H)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/07 11:42 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Seadrill Americas Inc identifying Other Affiliate Seadrill Offshore A S, Other Affiliate Seadrill UK Ltd, Other Affiliate Seadrill Rig Holding Company Ltd., Other Affiliate Seadrill Investment Holding Company Ltd, Other Affiliate Seadrill Limited for Seadrill Americas Inc. (aty,Held, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/07 11:36 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Seadrill Americas Inc.(Attorney Michael Franklin Held added to party Seadrill Americas Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Held, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/03 6:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Diamond Offshore L L C.(aty,Lampton, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/21 3:14 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Diamond Offshore L L C identifying Corporate Parent Noble Corp P L C, Corporate Parent Diamond Foreign Asset Co, Corporate Parent Diamond Offshore (Switzerland) GmbH, Corporate Parent Diamond Offshore Services LLC, Corporate Parent Diamond Offshore Finance Co, Corporate Parent Noble Offshore Drilling Inc for Diamond Offshore L L C. (aty,Lampton, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/20 9:46 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Offshore Energy Services L L C. (aty,Hughes, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Fri 01/17 7:58 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:6 Answer to Complaint, sent to John H Hughes on behalf of Offshore Energy Services L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/31/2025. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/16 3:46 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Offshore Energy Services L L C.(Attorney John H Hughes added to party Offshore Energy Services L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Hughes, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Wed 01/08 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to William D Lampton on behalf of Diamond Offshore L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/22/2025. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 01/08 1:03 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Diamond Offshore L L C answer due 2/3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/7/2025. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 01/07 9:04 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Diamond Offshore L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/7/2025.(Attorney William D Lampton added to party Diamond Offshore L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Lampton, William) Modified docket text on 1/7/2025 (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Tue 11/26 3:01 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Diamond Offshore L L C, Offshore Energy Services L L C, Seadrill Americas Inc. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/26 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6124773) filed by Stephen Meche.(Attorney Thomas R Galloway, Jr added to party Stephen Meche(pty:pla))(aty,Galloway, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/26 3:00 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]