Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Referred: Jeffery S Frensley
Case #: 3:24-cv-01399
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:0157(b)(5) Personal Injury Tort/Wrongful Death Claims
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Terminated:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 5:06 AM CST
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Plaintiff
Ryan D. McClintock
Represented By
Caroline Emhardt
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info
Russell W. Lewis, IV
Johnson Law Group
contact info
Joshua R. Harris
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
misc Annotation - Docket Tue 02/18 4:16 PM
***Case transferred from Tennessee Middle has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:25-cv-01662, filed 02/18/2025.*** (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
14 14 order Order Tue 02/04 9:32 AM
TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-499) of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Docket No. 2741, this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and electronically transmit the record to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 02/04/2024. (lh)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Docket Tue 02/04 9:48 AM
Case electronically transferred to the U.S. District Court for Northern District of California on this date. (hb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 02/04 9:49 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (hb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/14 8:37 AM
CONDITIONAL CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-499) IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITYLITIGATION (MDL NO. 2741) received from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. (Case ready for closing/transfer) (hb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
12 12 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/03 1:49 PM
ORDER granting7 and8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Caroline Emhardt and Joshua Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 01/03/2025. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/02 8:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ryan D. McClintock. Monsanto Company waiver sent on 12/17/2024. (Lewis, Russell)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 12/17 11:29 AM
Summons issued as to Monsanto Company. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Mon 12/16 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Lewis, Russell)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/16 3:18 PM
MOTION for attorney Joshua Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4221862) by Ryan D. McClintock.(Lewis, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/16 3:16 PM
MOTION for attorney Caroline Emhardt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4221769) by Ryan D. McClintock.(Lewis, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, December 02, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Mon 12/02 11:08 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/2/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Tue 11/26 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 2/25/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ad)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 11/26 4:36 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Tue 11/26 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Tue 11/26 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
Related: [-]
1 1 45 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/26 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4210499), filed by Ryan D. McClintock.(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 11/26 4:44 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Russell W. Lewis, IV admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 11/26 4:48 PM
CA State Bar status verified as active for Caroline Emhardt not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 11/26 4:50 PM
FL State Bar status verified as active for Joshua R. Harris not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - PHV Tue 11/26 4:51 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Joshua R. Harris, Caroline Emhardt: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/17/2024. (ad)
Related: [-]