Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Henry W Van Eck
Case #: 1:24-bk-03051
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Jan 08, 2025

Debtor
Union Cigar Hanover, LLC
1055 Carlisle Street
Hanover, PA 17331
Represented By
John Matthew Hyams
Law Offices Of John M. Hyams
contact info
Last checked: never
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
US Courthouse 1501 N. 6th St
Harrisburg, PA 17102
Trustee
Lawrence V. Young
CGA Law Firm (Trustee) 135 North George Street
York, PA 17401


Docket last updated: 11/27/2024 12:03 AM EST
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
crditcrd Auto-docket of credit card Tue 11/26 9:42 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:1:24-bk-03051] ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11280393, amount $ 338.00. Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 11/26 9:42 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $ 338.00 Filed by John Matthew Hyams of Law Offices of John M. Hyams on behalf of Union Cigar Hanover, LLC. (Hyams, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed) Tue 11/26 9:44 AM
Creditor List Uploaded. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by John Matthew Hyams of Law Offices of John M. Hyams on behalf of Union Cigar Hanover, LLC Related [+]. (Hyams, John)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 misc Declaration Tue 11/26 9:47 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Declaration re: , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors , Schedule A-B; Schedule D; Schedule E-F; Schedule G; Schedule H; Summary of Assets and Liabilities;, Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Filed by John Matthew Hyams of Law Offices of John M. Hyams on behalf of Union Cigar Hanover, LLC Related [+]. (Hyams, John)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 court Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Tue 11/26 10:01 PM
Meeting of Creditors and Appointment of Trustee Young, Lawrence V. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/8/2025 at 01:15 PM - w/Trustee Young join.zoom.us Meeting ID 402 683 1766, passcode 7248498808, Phone 1-267-552-4740. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]