New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Case #: 1:24-cv-09077
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1782 Assistance to Foreign Tribunals (incl letter rogatory)
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2024
Terminated:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 07, 2025 3:42 AM EST
Petitioner
Anastasiia Marchuk
P.O. Box 790 Palisade Ave.
Union City, NJ 07087
Petitioner
Weiguo Wang
Petitioner
Xiuling Wei
Petitioner
Yipeng Wang
Respondent
Yahoo, Inc.


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 12/04 11:59 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 5. Mailed to: AnastasiiaMarchuk P.O. Box 790 Palisade Ave. Union City, NJ 07087; WeiguoWang 4 Barmouth Street Manchester, M111963 UK; YipengWang 4 Barmouth Street Manchester, M113BZ UK. (tro)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
misc Remark Thu 12/12 10:20 AM
New Miscellaneous Case opened: 24mc556 pursuant to order at docket entry#5.(laq)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
5 5 4 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 12/03 9:14 AM
ORDER: The Court therefore directs the Clerk of Court to: (1) close this action, No. 24-CV-9077 (LTS), without prejudice to Petitioners litigating their claims in the miscellaneous case ; (2) open a new miscellaneous case for this matter; (3) docket a copy of this order and Petitioners' application and other filings (ECF 1-3) in the miscellaneous action; and (4) process the miscellaneous matter in accordance with the procedures of the Clerk's Office. Within 30 days of the date of this order, Petitioners must pay the $52.00 fee to file a miscellaneous action in this court, or to proceed without prepayment of the fee, each petitioner must submit a completed and signed application to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/27/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 11/27 11:42 AM
Related: [-]
misc Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk Tue 12/03 9:23 AM
Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk. Transmitted re:5 Order of Dismissal to Attorney Services/Help Desk for case processing..(rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
4 4 order Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs Tue 11/26 4:49 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (vba)
Related: [-]
service Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party Tue 11/26 4:49 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information..(vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 11/26 4:51 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vba)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Wed 11/27 1:36 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case..(tro)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 23, 2024
3 3 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Tue 11/26 4:48 PM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Xiuling Wei consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Xiuling Wei.(vba)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/26 4:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (vba)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition (Other) Tue 11/26 4:44 PM
PETITION Application. Document filed by Weiguo Wang, Xiuling Wei, Anastasiia Marchuk, Yipeng Wang.(vba)
Related: [-]