New York Northern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Brindisi
Referred: Therese Wiley Dancks
Case #: 6:24-cv-01435
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 4:55 AM EST
Defendant
Mohawk Valley Health System
Represented By
Michael J. Sciotti
Barclay Damon LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Karina Mejias
Represented By
Gregory W. Kirschenbaum
Phillips & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
14 14 misc Status Report Tue 05/06 3:59 PM
STATUS REPORT by Karina Mejias. (Kirschenbaum, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 9:07 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brienna Lauren Braman on behalf of Mohawk Valley Health System (Braman, Brienna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
12 12 adr Stipulation Selecting Mediator Tue 03/25 12:43 PM
STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that James E. Hacker has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Michael J. Sciotti and Gregory Kirschenbaum. Dated: March 25, 2025(Sciotti, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
11 11 order Status Report Order Wed 02/26 5:23 PM
TEXT STATUS REPORT ORDER: Plaintiff to file joint status report by 5/2/2025 re: whether R. 33 and 34 Requests have been timely served and responded to, status of discovery and any discovery issues, date for mediation, and depositions scheduled, if any. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/26/2025. (sg)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mandatory Mediation Wed 02/26 5:11 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation: Deadline for Mediator Selection is 3/24/2025. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 5/30/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/26/2025. (sg)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Uniform Pretrial Scheduling Order Wed 02/26 5:09 PM
UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5 days, to be held at Utica NY. Any outstanding Rule 26(a) Mandatory Disclosures due 2/28/2025. Rule 33 and 34 Requests to be served by 3/28/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 5/30/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Deadline is 9/15/2025. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 10/31/2025. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 11/17/2025. Discovery due by 12/15/2025. Discovery Motions due 12/29/2025. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 2/16/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/28/2025. (sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 02/24 2:48 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/24/2025. Appearances: Gregory Kirschenbaum, Esq. for Plaintiff; Michael Sciotti, Esq. for Defendant. Court reviews Civil Case Management Plan. Any outstanding R. 26 Disclosures to be completed by 2/28/2025. Case referred into Mandatory Mediation. Pretrial deadlines are established, a scheduling order and mediation referral order will be issued. (sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
notice Notice - Other Tue 02/18 1:35 PM
***PLEASE READ*** IMPORTANT TEXT NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: the 2/24/2025 10:30am Telephone Initial Conference: Counsel are directed to call the following number for this conference: 315-691-0477, and enter ID code 212 312 285 to connect to the conference. (sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
8 8 9 pgs misc Civil Case Management Plan Mon 02/17 11:37 AM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Mohawk Valley Health System. (Sciotti, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/13 2:13 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Mohawk Valley Health System.(Sciotti, Michael) Modified on 2/13/2025 (jel, )
Related: [-]
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Thu 02/13 2:53 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re7 Answer to Complaint filed by Mohawk Valley Health System - Defendant inadvertently filed a copy of the complaint with the answer for Dkt. No.7 . Defendant then refiled the answer. Dkt. No. 8 . Clerk deleted the incorrect entry and renumbered the correct answer filing as Dkt.7 to follow sequential order on the docket. (jel, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
6 6 order Order Reassigning Case Fri 01/03 11:53 AM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Anthony J. Brindisi for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes no longer assigned to case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 1/3/2025. (ztc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
5 5 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/18 12:02 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karina Mejias. Mohawk Valley Health System waiver sent on 12/13/2024, answer due 2/11/2025. (Kirschenbaum, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/16 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Sciotti on behalf of Mohawk Valley Health System (Sciotti, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
3 3 15 pgs misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Tue 11/26 11:57 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/24/2025 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/18/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ham)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 11/26 11:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Mohawk Valley Health System. (ham)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/26 11:56 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Mohawk Valley Health System (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6945387) filed by Karina Mejias.(ham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet