Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 9:24-bk-90233
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
HOOPER'S RE HOLDING LLC
550 Ramsey Ave
Whitefish, MT 59937-3128
Represented By
MATTHEW F. SHIMANEK
Shimanek Law PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE
US DEPT OF JUSTICE 550 WEST FORT ST, RM 698
BOISE, ID 83724


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
42 42 misc Certificate of Service - Attorney Event Tue 04/29 8:09 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC Related [+]. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 38 Order Denying Approval Of Disclosure Statement, Order Setting Hearing
41 41 plan Amended Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 8:08 PM
Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC Related [+]. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 21 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC
40 40 plan Amended Chapter 11 Plan (Pre-Confirmation) Tue 04/29 8:07 PM
Amended Chapter 11 Plan dated April 29, 2025. Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC Related [+].(SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 20 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit
Saturday, April 26, 2025
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing Sat 04/26 10:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 38 Order Denying Approval Of Disclosure Statement
Thursday, April 24, 2025
38 38 2 pgs order Order Denying Approval Of Disclosure Statement Thu 04/24 3:07 PM
Order Denying Approval Of Disclosure Statement, Setting New Deadlines and Confirmation Hearing Signed by Judge Benjamin Hursh on 4/24/2025 Related [+]. Amended Disclosure Statement and Plan due by 4/29/2025. Objections to Amended Disclosure Statement due by 5/6/2025. CONFIRMATION HEARING scheduled for 5/13/2025 at 09:00 AM at 2601 2ND AVE NORTH, BILLINGS, MT . (CEH)
Related: [-] 21 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC,
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
37 37 audio Digital Audio Tue 04/15 12:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/15/2025 9:25:47 AM ]. File Size [ 15632 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:32:34 ]. (AdminMontana)
Related: [-]
36 36 court Minutes of Hearing Held Tue 04/15 11:25 AM
Minutes of Hearing Held; Appearances by: Brett R. Cahoon, Attorney for Trustee. Matthew Shimanek, Attorney for Debtor. Seamus McCulloch, Attorney for Hoopers Nursery Inc. Hearing commenced at 09:25 AM and concluded at 09:59 AM Related [+]. (HMJ)
Related: [-] 24 Order Setting Hearing,25 Order Setting Hearing
Monday, April 14, 2025
35 35 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/14 7:56 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025. Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
34 34 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/14 7:55 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025. Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
33 33 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/14 7:54 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 01/31/2025. Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
32 32 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/14 7:53 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 12/31/2024. Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
31 31 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/14 7:52 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 11/30/2024. Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, April 10, 2025
30 30 misc List of Exhibits - Attorney Event Thu 04/10 7:21 PM
List of Witnesses for Upcoming April 15, 2025 Hearing., List of Exhibits for Upcoming April 15, 2025 Hearing. Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
29 29 plan Objection to Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement Wed 04/09 6:14 PM
Objection to Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement Filed by HOOPERS NURSERY INC. Related [+]. (SAMSON, RICHARD)
Related: [-] 21 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC
Monday, April 07, 2025
28 28 plan Objection to Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement Mon 04/07 3:21 PM
Objection to Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement Filed by OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE Related [+]. (CAHOON, BRETT)
Related: [-] 21 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC
Thursday, March 06, 2025
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing Thu 03/06 10:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order Setting Hearing
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing Thu 03/06 10:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 03/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order Setting Hearing
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Tue 03/04 2:34 PM
Order Setting Show Cause Hearing Signed on 3/4/2025 Related [+]. SHOW CAUSE HEARING scheduled for 4/15/2025 at 09:00 AM at 201 E. BROADWAY, MISSOULA, MT . (CEH)
Related: [-] 22 Notice of Delinquent Monthly Operating Reports filed by U.S. Trustee OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE,23 Notification of Debtor(s)'s Quarterly Fees filed by U.S. Trustee OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE
24 24 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Tue 03/04 2:31 PM
Order Setting Hearing on Approval of Disclosure Statement. 4/8/2025 is fixed as the last day for filing and serving written objections to the Disclosure Statement. Signed on 3/4/2025 Related [+]. HEARING ON APPROVAL OF DISCLOSURE STATEMENT scheduled for 4/15/2025 at 09:00 AM at 201 E. BROADWAY, MISSOULA, MT . (CEH)
Related: [-] 20 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC,21 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC
23 23 trustee Notification of Debtor(s)'s Quarterly Fees Tue 03/04 12:20 PM
Notification by Office of U.S. Trustee of Debtor(s)'s Quarterly Fees 4th Quarter 2024. (CAHOON, BRETT)
Related: [-]
22 22 trustee Notice of Delinquent Monthly Operating Reports Tue 03/04 12:18 PM
Notice of Delinquent Monthly Operating Reports. (CAHOON, BRETT)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
21 21 15 pgs plan Disclosure Statement Fri 02/28 7:59 PM
Disclosure Statement to Plan dated February 28, 2025 Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC Related [+]. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC
20 20 12 pgs plan Chapter 11 Plan Fri 02/28 7:58 PM
Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization dated February 28, 2025 Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC Related [+].(SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, February 27, 2025
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Thu 02/27 10:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 02/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order on Motion to Extend Time - BK
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
18 18 order Extend Time Tue 02/25 10:34 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+]. The automatic stay under 11 U.S.C. § 362(a) shall remain in effect through 2/28/2025. Signed on 2/25/2025. (CEH)
Related: [-] 17
Saturday, February 22, 2025
17 17 motion Motion to Extend Time - BK Sat 02/22 9:53 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Debtor HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
trustee Meeting of Creditors Held (Paperless Event) Mon 01/06 2:25 PM
341 Meeting of Creditors Held Related [+]. (CAHOON, BRETT)
Related: [-] 3 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Wednesday, December 25, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ Wed 12/25 10:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Application/Motion to Employ
Monday, December 23, 2024
15 15 order Employ Mon 12/23 11:29 AM
Order Approving Application to Employ Matt Shimanek as Attorney for the Debtor Related [+] Signed on 12/23/2024. (CEH)
Related: [-] 14
14 14 5 pgs motion Application/Motion to Employ Mon 12/23 8:46 AM
Application to Employ Matt Shimanek as Attorney for the Debtor Filed by Debtor HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 12/20 3:27 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by RICHARD J. SAMSON Filed by on behalf of HOOPERS NURSERY INC.. (SAMSON, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
12 12 misc All Schedules, Statement of Affairs, Statement of Intent & Summary of Schedules - Attorney Event Tue 12/17 10:25 PM
All Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Statement of Intent & Summary of Schedules Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 15, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules Sun 12/15 10:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Friday, December 13, 2024
10 10 order Extend Deadline to File Schedules Fri 12/13 4:08 PM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Related [+] Signed on 12/13/2024. Debtor shall file all required documents necessary to cure the deficiencies in this case on or before 12/17/2024. (CEH)
Related: [-] 9
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
9 9 motion Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules Tue 12/10 11:10 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Debtor HOOPER'S RE HOLDINGS LLC. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 01, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Amendment (No Fee Required) Sun 12/01 9:00 PM
Amended Notice of Amendment (No Fee Required), Amended Schedules Voluntary Petition Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDING LLC. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
7 7 notice Notice of Amendment (No Fee Required) Sun 12/01 8:29 PM
Notice of Amendment (No Fee Required), Amended Schedules Voluntary Petition Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDING LLC. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Petition
Att: 2 Exhibit Matrix
6 6 misc Petition - Attorney Event Sun 12/01 8:22 PM
Petition Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDING LLC. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice Fri 11/29 10:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Deficiency Notice All Chapters
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 11/29 10:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 11/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.) Wed 11/27 2:17 PM
341 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/6/2025 at 10:00 AM via Telephonic 341 Meeting - Chapter 11. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 3/7/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 4/7/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/27/2025. (SAJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Deficiency Notice All Chapters Wed 11/27 9:09 AM
Deficiency Notice Incomplete Filings due by 12/10/2024. (SAJ)
Related: [-]
court Add Judge Wed 11/27 8:54 AM
Judge BENJAMIN P. HURSH added to case (SAJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 11/26 7:51 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by HOOPER'S RE HOLDING LLC. Atty Disclosure Statement due 12/10/2024. Employee Income Record Due: 12/10/2024. Schedule A due 12/10/2024. Schedule B due 12/10/2024. Schedule D due 12/10/2024. Schedule E due 12/10/2024. Schedule F due 12/10/2024. Schedule G due 12/10/2024. Schedule H due 12/10/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 12/10/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 12/10/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 12/10/2024. Chapter 11 Plan due by 03/26/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 03/26/2025. (SHIMANEK, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 11/26 7:54 PM
Filing fee information: Receipt number A3098700 . Regarding the filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:9:24-bk-90233] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1