Original Case: 2:22-cv-02220

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-03137
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2024
Terminated:Dec 17, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2024 4:09 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
CARLA BOYD
Represented By
Brian M. Smith
HEYL, ROYSTER, VOELKER & ALLEN, P.C.
contact info
Christopher John Drinkwine
HEYL, ROYSTER, VOELKER & ALLEN, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF URBANA, ILLINOIS
Represented By
Brian M. Smith
HEYL, ROYSTER, VOELKER & ALLEN, P.C.
contact info
Christopher John Drinkwine
HEYL, ROYSTER, VOELKER & ALLEN, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CAROL MITTEN
Represented By
Brian M. Smith
HEYL, ROYSTER, VOELKER & ALLEN, P.C.
contact info
Christopher John Drinkwine
HEYL, ROYSTER, VOELKER & ALLEN, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WEINER COMPANIES, LTD.
Represented By
Robert E. Jacobson
FLYNN, PALMER, TAGUE, LYKE & JACOBSON
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DALE KRAMER
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHARLES HORN
Represented By
Charles Horn
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/18/2024 3:34 AM CST
Friday, November 22, 2024
1 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Charles Horn by 11/29/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 12/06/2024. [1] [7419776] 24-3137 (HTP) [Entered: 11/25/2024 09:26 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 33 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Cheris Kramarae and 502 W. Main St. LLC. [2] [7419779] 24-3137 (HTP) [Entered: 11/25/2024 09:30 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 No attorney(s) added for Appellee Dale Kramer, per District Court docket and information sheet. [3] [7419780] 24-3137 (HTP) [Entered: 11/25/2024 09:31 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7419784] [4] [7419784] 24-3137 (HTP) [Entered: 11/25/2024 09:35 AM]
Related: [-]