New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine Polk Failla
Case #: 1:24-cv-09092
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2024
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 5:45 AM EST
Defendant
Raw Sport Supplement Company LLC
Plaintiff
Denise Crumwell
On Behalf Of Herself And All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Associates PLLC 150 E. 18th Street Suite PHR
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Michael A. LaBollita
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/21 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Raw Sport Supplement Company LLC. Document filed by Denise Crumwell. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 02/13 12:33 PM
ORDER: By letter dated February 12, 2025, the parties reported to the Court that they have reached a settlement in principle in this case. (Dkt. #7). Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that this action be dismissed and discontinued without prejudice and without costs. Within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order, the parties may submit to the Court their own Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal for the Court to So Order, or, Plaintiff may apply by letter motion to reopen the action in the event that the settlement is not consummated. Upon such application for reinstatement, the parties shall continue to be subject to the Court's jurisdiction, the Court shall promptly reinstate the action to its active docket, and the parties shall be directed to appear before the Court, without the necessity of additional process, on a date within ten (10) days of the application, to schedule remaining pretrial proceedings and/or dispositive motions, as appropriate. If Plaintiff fails to file an application to reopen by the aforementioned deadline, untimely applications may be denied solely on that basis. This Order shall be deemed a final dismissal and discontinuance of the action with prejudice in the event that Plaintiff has not requested restoration of the case to the active calendar within such 60-day period. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions, adjourn all remaining dates, and close this case. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/13/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 02/12 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Settlement With Prejudice . Document filed by Denise Crumwell..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 12/06 3:14 PM
ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on April 4, 2025, at 2:30 p.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (855) 244-8681 and enter access code 2315 780 7370. Initial Conference set for 4/4/2025 at 02:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/6/2024) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 12/02 8:50 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Raw Sport Supplement Company LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 12/02 8:49 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 12/02 8:49 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 12/02 8:49 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 28, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 11/28 12:09 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Raw Sport Supplement Company LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Denise Crumwell..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 11/28 12:05 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/27 12:37 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Denise Crumwell..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/27 12:31 AM
COMPLAINT against Raw Sport Supplement Company LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30247832)Document filed by Denise Crumwell..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]