New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Steven Tiscione
Case #: 2:24-cv-08266
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2024
Case in other court:Supreme Court State of New York, Nassau County, 618485/2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 5:23 AM EST
Defendant
Long Island Plastic Surgical Group, P.C.
999 Franklin Avenue
Garden City, NY 11530
Represented By
Michael Marcucci
Jones Day
contact info
Leah Murphy
Jones Day - New York
contact info
Plaintiff
John Niessing
Represented By
Vicki J. Maniatis
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 02/12 5:21 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Stay pending the outcome of mediation. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 2/12/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
11 11 motion Stay Tue 02/11 4:39 PM
Letter MOTION to Stay Pending Mediation addressed to the Hon. Steven L.Tiscione by Long Island Plastic Surgical Group, P.C.. (Marcucci, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
10 10 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 01/16 3:54 PM
First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Long Island Plastic Surgical Group, P.C.. (Murphy, Leah)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 01/16 6:30 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Leah Murphy terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 1/16/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/20 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Marcucci on behalf of Long Island Plastic Surgical Group, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Marcucci, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/20 6:49 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Long Island Plastic Surgical Group, P.C. answer due 2/14/2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/20/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 12/19 6:46 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, or move w/r/t Complaint by Long Island Plastic Surgical Group, P.C.. (Murphy, Leah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 12/05 9:51 AM
ORDER terminating5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Long Island Plastic Surgical Group, P.C. answer due 1/3/2025.; granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Long Island Plastic Surgical Group, P.C. answer due 1/3/2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/5/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/04 2:18 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, or move w/r/t Complaint by Long Island Plastic Surgical Group, P.C.. (Murphy, Leah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Tue 12/03 8:31 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (LF)
Related: [-]
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 12/03 8:29 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione for all further proceedings. Judge Hector Gonzalez no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/2/2024. (LF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/02 10:42 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, or move w/r/t Complaint, and notice of motion for related cases in Kakish v. Long Island Plastic Surgical Group, P.C., No. 2:24-cv-07341-ST (E.D.N.Y.) by Long Island Plastic Surgical Group, P.C.. (Murphy, Leah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation Wed 11/27 2:30 PM
Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (LJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 11/27 2:26 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (LJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 11/27 2:22 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 11/27 1:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Long Island Plastic Surgical Group, P.C. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, case number 618485/2024. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18536167) (Murphy, Leah) Modified on 11/27/2024 (LJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Affirmation of Service
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/27 2:25 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Hector Gonzalez. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]