Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Case #: 1:24-cv-24678
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause42:11601 International Child Abduction Remedies Act
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2024
Terminated:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 5:27 AM EST
Defendant
Edan Raz
Represented By
Catherine Magdalena Rodriguez
Filler Rodriguez, LLP
contact info
Petitioner
Moti Shenfarber
Represented By
Brett Alan Barfield
Pag Law PLLC
contact info
Sydney Brooke Alexander
Holland , Knight
contact info
Douglas Hooper Lehtinen
Holland , Knight LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 03/18 9:49 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/18/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Mon 03/17 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Moti Shenfarber (Alexander, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
19 19 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/12 9:01 AM
ORDER: The Plaintiff shall file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. re 18 Order. The case shall remain STAYED and CLOSED. Related [+] Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/11/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-] ply due by 3/17/2025.
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
18 18 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 12/17 10:13 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER on17 the Plaintiff's Notice of Return of Child Pursuant to Settlement. The Plaintiff must file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by January 16, 2025. All other pending deadlines and hearings are TERMINATED , and any pending motions are DENIED as MOOT. The case shall remain closed and stayed, and the six-week period for us to adjudicate the merits of the petition under the Hague Convention shall remain tolled. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/17/2024. (rr01)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/16 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Return of Minor Child by Moti Shenfarber (Alexander, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Expedited Motion Fri 12/13 10:13 AM
ORDER Granting15 Joint Expedited Motion for Entry of Agreed Order Upon Settlement. The case shall remain STAYED and CLOSED. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
15 15 motion Expedited Motion Thu 12/12 12:06 PM
Joint EXPEDITED MOTION Entry of Agreed Order Upon Settlement by Moti Shenfarber.(Alexander, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulation Between Edan Raz and Moti Shenfarber,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion to Seal Wed 12/11 10:54 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER DIRECTING the parties to file a Notice of Settlement by January 13, 2024. The December 12, 2024, hearing is hereby CANCELLED in light of the parties informing the Court that they are in the process of finalizing settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE and STAY the case, and the six-week period for adjudication on the merits of a return petition under the Hague Convention is hereby TOLLED , while the parties finalize settlement. All pending motions, including the5 Motion to Seal are DENIED as MOOT . The Court will not inquire into the nature of the settlement. If the parties want us to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of their settlement, they must provide us with a copy of their settlement agreement. We won't retain jurisdiction over a settlement agreement we haven't seen or approved. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/11/2024. (rr01)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 12/11 11:24 AM
The Show Cause Hearing set for 12/12/2024 10:15 AM in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman is CANCELLED per Order on [ECF No. 14] (jao)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Wed 12/11 12:33 PM
Case Stayed Closing Case. PER DE#14 (cds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
13 13 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 12/10 12:38 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned/Rule to Show Cause Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 response/answer due 12/11/2024. (cds)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 12/09 11:51 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING in part11 the Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint. The Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by December 11, 2024, at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/9/2024. (rr01)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 12/06 3:58 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Edan Raz.(Rodriguez, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 24-cv-24678 Proposed Unopposed Order On Extension
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 12/06 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Magdalena Rodriguez on behalf of Edan Raz. Attorney Catherine Magdalena Rodriguez added to party Edan Raz(pty:dft). (Rodriguez, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 12/04 3:26 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/12/2024 10:15 AM in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/4/2024. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Wed 12/04 3:27 PM
Set Response/Answer Due Deadline: Edan Raz response/answer due 12/9/2024. PER DE#9 (cds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 12/03 8:24 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge James I. Cohn recused. Case reassigned to Judge Roy K. Altman for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 12/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/02 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Edwin Freedman by Moti Shenfarber (Alexander, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Edwin Freedman
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/02 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Moti Shenfarber re5 MOTION to Seal Motion to File Under Seal and Ex Parte A Notice Disclosing the Location of the Minor Child per Local Rule 5.4 (Alexander, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 motion Motion to Seal (Public) Mon 12/02 1:27 PM
MOTION to Seal Motion to File Under Seal and Ex Parte A Notice Disclosing the Location of the Minor Child per Local Rule 5.4 by Moti Shenfarber. (Alexander, Sydney)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Clerk's Notice Re Expedited Review - ICARA Only Mon 12/02 12:04 PM
Clerk's Notice Re Expedited Review - Pursuant to Court policy, petitions filed under The Hague Convention and ICARA should be resolved within six-weeks from the initial filing of the petition. See Internal Operating Procedures, Section 2.18.00, on the Courts website. (yar)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 12/02 9:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Edan Raz. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 12/02 9:35 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/27 3:34 PM
COMPLAINT Verified Petition For Return of Child To Israel and Issuance of Show Cause Order against Moti Shenfarber. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18016819, filed by Moti Shenfarber.(Alexander, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Apostille of Israel Court Order,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summon(s)