California Central District Court
Judge:Hernan D Vera
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:24-cv-10296
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2024
Terminated:Mar 14, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, 24STCV28250
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 2:34 AM PST
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Keith Haeffele
Payne And Fears LLP
contact info
Leilani Elizabeth Jones
Payne And Fears LLP
contact info
Daniel F Fears
Payne And Fears LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Alberto Mendez
Represented By
Ricardo Manuel Martin
Angel City Law PC
contact info
Ji-Su Park
Angel City Law, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, March 14, 2025
27 27 order Compel Arbitration Fri 03/14 1:32 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDERS RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL [DKT. NO. 14] by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration ("Motion") [Dkt. No. 14]. CVS argues that this action must be sent to arbitration and dismissed because the parties have agreed to arbitrate all issues, including disputes about arbitrability. For the reasons detailed below, the Court agrees. The parties delegated arbitrability by assenting to CVS's arbitration policy, which contains a valid delegation clause. CVS's motion is granted, and the action is referred to arbitration pursuant to the parties' agreement. (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
26 26 misc Report Tue 03/11 3:01 PM
JOINT REPORT of RULE 26(f) filed by Plaintiff Alberto Mendez. (Park, Ji-Su)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
25 25 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 02/25 5:13 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds DEFENDANT'S TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS ACTION14 appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing set for 02/27/25 is hereby vacated and the matter taken off calendar. The matter will be deemed submitted on the vacated hearing date. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
24 24 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 02/13 12:09 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration14 and Dismiss Action filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
23 23 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 02/10 8:16 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ALL ASSOCIATED FRCP 26 DEADLINES22 by Judge Hernan D. Vera. The Scheduling Conference is hereby continued from March 11, 2025, to March 25, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
22 22 stip Continue Thu 02/06 12:30 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference and All Associated FRCP 26 Deadlines from March 11, 2025 to March 25, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference and All Associated FRCP 26 Deadlines
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
21 21 respm Declaration (Motion related) Tue 01/28 11:25 PM
DECLARATION of ALBERTO MENDEZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration14 filed by Plaintiff Alberto Mendez. (Park, Ji-Su)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Tue 01/28 11:22 PM
PLAINTIFF ALBERTO MENDEZ'S OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration14 filed by Plaintiff Alberto Mendez. (Park, Ji-Su)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
19 19 respm Declaration (Motion related) Tue 01/14 4:20 PM
DECLARATION of Lorne Dunkerton in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration14 and Dismiss Action filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Declaration (Motion related) Tue 01/14 4:18 PM
DECLARATION of Melanie K. St Angelo in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration14 and Dismiss Action filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Declaration (Motion related) Tue 01/14 4:14 PM
DECLARATION of Robert Bailey in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration14 and Dismiss Action filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
16 16 respm Declaration (Motion related) Tue 01/14 4:10 PM
DECLARATION of Cierra Parker in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration14 and Dismiss Action filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
15 15 respm Declaration (Motion related) Tue 01/14 4:05 PM
DECLARATION of Leilani E. Jones in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration14 and Dismiss Action filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H
14 14 motion Compel Arbitration Tue 01/14 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Hernan D. Vera. (Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action
Thursday, December 26, 2024
13 13 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 12/26 4:51 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2025 at 10:00 AM. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
12 12 18 pgs order Order Tue 12/17 6:59 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
11 11 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Thu 12/05 10:14 AM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Hernan D. Vera for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-10296-HDV (AJRx). (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
10 10 cs_rasgn Reassign Case - Self -Recusal - (CV-52) Wed 12/04 5:03 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:24-cv-10296 CBM(AJRx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 12/02 8:51 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 12/02 8:51 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 12/02 8:50 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
6 6 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 11/27 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., identifying CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc For Judicial Notice Wed 11/27 2:59 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
4 4 misc Declaration Wed 11/27 2:52 PM
DECLARATION of Tiffani E. Engstrom re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 AND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
3 3 misc Declaration Wed 11/27 2:47 PM
DECLARATION of Leilani E. Jones re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 AND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 11/27 2:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 11/27 2:39 PM
PETITION AND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332 AND 1441 Receipt No: ACACDC-38667150 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attorney Leilani Elizabeth Jones added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 12/02 5:54 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Alberto Mendez. Filed in State Court on 10/28/2024 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 12/02 5:56 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal1 .(car)
Related: [-]