Montana District Court
Judge:John Johnston
Case #: 2:24-cv-00188
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 3:03 AM MST
Defendant
Holmes Digital Investigation
Plaintiff
Ranches Of The West, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph A. Soueidi
Felt Martin, PC
contact info
Roberta Berkhof
Felt Martin PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
4 4 service Certificate of Service Tue 01/21 2:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ranches Of The West, Inc. Certification of Service of Process (Berkhof, Roberta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Return of Service on Complaint and Summons
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing - SDM Tue 01/21 3:10 PM
Set Deadlines: Holmes Digital Investigation answer due 2/3/2025. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/27 4:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ranches Of The West, Inc.. (Berkhof, Roberta)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 11/27 4:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Holmes Digital Investigation. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (MMS)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint - SDM Wed 11/27 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Holmes Digital Investigation, filed by Ranches Of The West, Inc. (MMS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 10 Proposed Summons
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 11/27 4:01 PM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number AMTDC-3377282 (MMS)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 11/27 4:08 PM
Reminder: Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3, Attorneys must update any change in name, email, mailing address, law firm affiliation, and/or telephone through their PACER accounts. (MMS)
Related: [-]