California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:24-cv-10317
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 2:37 AM PST
Defendant
AMG National Trust
Represented By
Bruce A Ericson
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Defendant
American Bank, Inc.
Defendant
Evolve Bancorp, Inc.
Defendant
Lineage Bank
Defendant
Evolve Bank and Trust
Plaintiff
Ashley Felton
Represented By
Blake J Lindemann
Lindemann Law Firm Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
55 55 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Wed 05/14 10:24 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS by Judge George H Wu. The court, having considered the Stipulation and finding good cause, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS as follows: 1. Defendant LINEAGE BANK shall have until June 11, 2025, to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint. RE: Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer,53 . (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
54 54 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Mon 05/12 11:16 AM
ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) by Judge George H Wu. The Court, having considered the Stipulation and finding good cause, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS that the Evolve Defendants shall have until June 11, 2025 to respond to the Complaint. RE: STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer52 . (aco)
Related: [-]
53 53 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Fri 05/09 9:21 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 11, 2025 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Lineage Bank.(Tricker, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By More Than 30 Days