Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Referred: Catherine M Salinas
Case #: 1:24-cv-05406
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause12:2601 Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2025 4:27 AM EST
Defendant
Newrez, LLC
Interested Party
FirstKey Mortgage
Interested Party
Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff
Janice Moody
Represented By
Matthew G Rosendahl
Kelly Guzzo, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
39 39 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 05/09 4:19 PM
ORDER granting37 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court hereby extends the time for Plaintiff to file her response to Defendant's Motion to Strike and for Judgment on the Pleadings (Motion to Strike) Doc.25 until and including June 5, 2025; and further extends the time for Defendant to file a reply in support of its Motion to Strike until and including July 3, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 05/09/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
38 38 discov Certificate of Service Fri 05/09 2:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Janice Moody.(Rosendahl, Matthew)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Extension of Time Fri 05/09 2:14 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response and Reply re:25 MOTION to Strike6 Amended Complaint, Motion to Strike Class Allegations & for Judgment on the Pleadings MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Janice Moody.(Rosendahl, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
36 36 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Fri 05/09 11:00 AM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Stipulated Order Governing Disclosure of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 05/09/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
35 35 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Fri 05/09 10:57 AM
ORDER granting29 Motion for Protocol Governing the Production of Documents Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 05/09/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
34 34 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Fri 05/09 10:55 AM
ORDER granting28 Motion for Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 05/09/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Proposed Order Fri 05/09 10:26 AM
Proposed ORDER Proposed Stipulated Order Governing the Disclosure of Documents re:30 Joint MOTION for Order Governing Disclosure of Documents . (Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Proposed Order Fri 05/09 10:24 AM
Proposed ORDER Proposed Protocol Governing the Production of Documents re:29 Joint MOTION for Order for Entry of Protocol Governing the Production of Documents . (Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Proposed Order Fri 05/09 10:23 AM
Proposed ORDER Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order re:28 Joint MOTION for Order for Entry of Discovery Confidentiality Order . (Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
30 30 motion For Order Thu 05/08 7:21 PM
Joint MOTION for Order Governing Disclosure of Documents with Brief In Support by Newrez, LLC.(Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Stipulated Order re Disclosure of Documents
29 29 motion For Order Thu 05/08 7:14 PM
Joint MOTION for Order for Entry of Protocol Governing the Production of Documents with Brief In Support by Newrez, LLC.(Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Protocol re Production of Documents
28 28 motion For Order Thu 05/08 7:12 PM
Joint MOTION for Order for Entry of Discovery Confidentiality Order with Brief In Support by Newrez, LLC.(Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Confidentiality Order
27 27 discov Certificate of Service Thu 05/08 10:03 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re19 Certificate of Service Supplemental Production of Documents by Newrez, LLC.(Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
26 26 discov Certificate of Service Thu 05/01 4:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re19 Certificate of Service Supplemental Production of Documents by Newrez, LLC.(Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Strike Thu 05/01 12:49 PM
MOTION to Strike6 Amended Complaint, Motion to Strike Class Allegations & for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Newrez, LLC.(Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief In Support of Motion to Strike
Friday, April 18, 2025
24 24 discov Certificate of Service Fri 04/18 1:59 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re19 Certificate of Service Responses to First Interrogatories by Newrez, LLC.(Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
23 23 discov Certificate of Service Mon 04/14 10:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re19 Certificate of Service of Discovery Responses by Newrez, LLC.(Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
22 22 discov Certificate of Service Tue 03/04 10:18 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Amended Initial Disclosures) by Newrez, LLC.(Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
21 21 discov Certificate of Service Fri 02/28 4:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Newrez, LLC.(Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
20 20 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/27 2:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:18 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 5/29/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 02/27/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
19 19 discov Certificate of Service Wed 02/26 5:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant by Janice Moody.(Rosendahl, Matthew)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 02/26 5:09 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Janice Moody. (Rosendahl, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Filing Tue 02/25 6:52 PM
NOTICE of Filing Joint Statement under Local Rule 23(C)(2) by Janice Moody (Rosendahl, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 discov Certificate of Service Tue 02/25 6:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Janice Moody.(Rosendahl, Matthew)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Certificate of Service Tue 02/25 4:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Newrez, LLC of Initial Disclosures (Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 02/20 11:19 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time and extends the time for Plaintiff to move for class certification until and including June 20, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 02/20/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
13 13 4 pgs motion Extension of Time Wed 02/19 4:59 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Class Certification with Brief In Support by Janice Moody.(Rosendahl, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, January 31, 2025
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/31 9:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING [Doc. 11] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian E. Pumphrey and GRANTING [Doc. 12] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Melissa O. Martinez. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/31/25. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/31 9:37 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney Melissa Martinez as to Newrez, LLC re Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 01/30 2:33 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:11 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian E. Pumphrey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14024066). Attorney Brian E. Pumphrey added appearing on behalf of Newrez, LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (jas)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 01/30 2:35 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:12 APPLICATION for Admission of Melissa O. Martinez Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14024073). Attorney Melissa Martinez added appearing on behalf of Newrez, LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (jas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
12 12 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/29 1:39 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Melissa O. Martinez Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14024073). with Brief In Support by Newrez, LLC. (Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/29 1:38 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Brian E. Pumphrey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14024066). with Brief In Support by Newrez, LLC. (Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
10 10 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 01/28 12:54 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Melissa Martinez. Clerk to follow-up by 2/7/2025. (jas)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 01/28 12:51 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Brian E. Pumphrey. Clerk to follow-up by 2/7/2025. (jas)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Tue 01/28 9:09 AM
Clerk's Notation re8 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Newrez, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate Rithm Capital Corp., f/k/a New Residential Investment Corp., Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC II, Other Affiliate Rithm Capital Corp. for Newrez, LLC. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/27 5:52 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Newrez, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate Rithm Capital Corp., f/k/a New Residential Investment Corp., Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC II, Other Affiliate Rithm Capital Corp. for Newrez, LLC. (Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 01/27 5:44 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Newrez, LLC. Discovery ends on 6/26/2025.(Burbine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/19 9:34 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Newrez, LLCwith Jury Demand filed by Janice Moody.(Rosendahl, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/09 9:21 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Janice Moody. Newrez, LLC waiver mailed on 11/27/2024, answer due 1/27/2025. (Rosendahl, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
4 4 4 pgs order Order Thu 12/05 11:48 AM
ORDER: I hereby ORDER Moody to file an amended complaint that omits the shotgun pleading provisions and otherwise complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of this Court, and the pleading standards articulated by the United States Supreme Court and the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals. The amended complaint shall be due no later than Wednesday, December 19, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 12/5/2024. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 11/27 10:19 AM
Clerk's Notation re2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janice Moody. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 11/27 9:19 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Newrez, LLC. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/27 9:15 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janice Moody. (jbu)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/27 9:14 AM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Janice Moody. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13886619)(jbu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet