Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Jamar K Walker
Referred: Douglas E Miller
Case #: 2:24-cv-00681
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Bivens Non-Prisoner
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 21, 2025 5:18 AM EDT
Defendant
John C. Phelan
Represented By
Sean Douglas Jansen
United States Attorney'S Office - Norfolk
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald J. Lowe
1011 Copper Stone Cir
Chesapeake, VA 23320


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
11 11 notice Notice (other) Mon 05/19 3:37 PM
NOTICE by John C. Phelan re10 Amended Complaint (Jansen, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/05 3:42 PM
(Subject to Defect - Leave of Court not requested and complaint unsigned) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Terrence Emmert, filed by Donald J. Lowe.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/05 3:38 PM
(Subject to Defect - Untimely) MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, re6 , filed by Donald J. Lowe.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, April 10, 2025
8 8 notice Notice (other) Thu 04/10 9:25 AM
NOTICE re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. A copy of this Notice was mailed to pro se Plaintiff on 4.10.25. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
7 7 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 04/09 4:13 PM
Memorandum in Support re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Carlos Del Toro. (Jansen, Sean)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 04/09 4:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Carlos Del Toro. (Jansen, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 02/28 3:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Carlos Del Toro (Dept. of the Navy), served on 2/13/2025. (epri, )
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 02/28 3:13 PM
SUMMONSES Returned Executed as to Carlos Del Toro (U.S. Atty and Atty General), served on 2/11/2025. (epri, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/28/2025) (epri, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 01/08 3:28 PM
Three (3) Summonses Issued as to Carlos Del Toro, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Pro se plaintiff notified that service packets are ready for pickup.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order Wed 12/04 4:27 PM
ORDER: If the plaintiff would like to proceed with this action, the plaintiff is ORDERED to provide the Court with three copies of his Complaint and exhibits within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order. Upon receipt of the additional copies, the Clerk will issue summonses and prepare service packets for the plaintiff. A copy of this Order sent to the plaintiff as DIRECTED on 12.4.24. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker and filed on 12/4/24. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/27 11:17 AM
COMPLAINT against Carlos Del Toro ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number 200005742.), filed by Donald J. Lowe.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Part 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit B Part 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit B Part 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit B Part 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit B Part 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit B Part 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit C,
Att: 9 Exhibit D,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 11 Receipt