Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10166

Maine Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Peter G Cary
Case #: 1:24-ap-01019
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Vision Care of Maine, Limited Liability Company
Represented By
David C. Johnson, Esq.
Marcus Clegg
contact info
Daniel L. Rosenthal, Esq.
Marcus Clegg
contact info
Defendant
Curt Tyler Young
Represented By
Richard P. Olson, Esq.
Curtis Thaxter LLC
contact info
Karina Shipman, Esq.
Curtis Thaxter LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC d/b/a Besse Medical
Represented By
Carol Ann Slocum
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg, LLP
contact info
Adam R. Prescott, Esq.
Bernstein Shur Sawyer & Nelson, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Saturday, May 03, 2025
123 123 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Sun 05/04 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 121 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, May 01, 2025
122 122 utility Update Other Deadlines (BK) Thu 05/01 4:32 PM
Deadlines Updated (BK) Related [+]. Reply deadline to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment extended to 5/13/2025 Per Order #121. (mnd)
Related: [-] 70 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC d/b/a Besse Medical
121 121 order Extend Time Thu 05/01 4:30 PM
Order Granting Fifth Motion to Enlarge Plaintiff's Deadline to Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Related [+]. This Order shall become final in fourteen (14) days unless a party in interest sooner objects, in which case the matter shall be set for hearing and considered by the Court as if this Order had not been entered.(mnd)
Related: [-] 120
120 120 motion Extend Time - Adversary Case Thu 05/01 10:27 AM
Fifth Motion to Enlarge Plaintiff's Deadline to Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed by ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC d/b/a Besse Medical. (Prescott, Adam)Modified on 5/1/2025 to remove duplicative text (mnd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order