Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-14240

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Gary Spraker
Case #: 2:24-ap-01179
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
LEWIS ROCA ROTHBERBER CHRISTIE LLP
3993 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY SUITE 600
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
LEWIS ROCA ROTHBERBER CHRISTIE LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dan R White
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP 3993 Howard Hughes Parkway Suite 600
Las Vegas, NV 89169
Represented By
Dan R White
contact info
Defendant
Glenn J Light
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP 3993 Howard Hughes Parkway Suite 600
Las Vegas, NV 89169
Represented By
Glenn J Light
contact info
Defendant
ANDREW WATT
Kung & Brown 1020 Garces Avenue
Las Vegas, NV 89101
Represented By
ANDREW WATT
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL VENNER
Kung & Brown 1020 Garces Avenue
Las Vegas, NV 89101
Represented By
MICHAEL VENNER
contact info
Defendant
PHILLIP KONSTAM
Kung & Brown 1020 Garces Avenue
Las Vegas, NV 89101
Represented By
PHILLIP KONSTAM
contact info
Defendant
State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Gaming Commission
7 State of Nevada Way
Las Vegas, NV 89119
Represented By
State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Gaming Commission
contact info
Plaintiff
SBC Nevada LLC, individually and for the claims for the Estate of Miomni Gaming Limited
10848 Ickworth Ct
Las Vegas, NV 89135
Represented By
STEVEN K EISENBERG
Stern & Eisenberg, PC
contact info
MATTHEW L SHARP
Matthew L. Sharp, Ltd
contact info
STEVEN KEITH EISENBERG
Stern & Eisenberg
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
41 41 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Mon 04/14 4:22 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 39 Stipulation filed by Defendant LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, Defendant DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL, Defendant GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL.
Thursday, April 10, 2025
40 40 answer Reply Thu 04/10 3:37 PM
Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service Filed by JOSEPH P. GARIN on behalf of LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL, DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL Related [+] (GARIN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-] 36 Opposition filed by Plaintiff SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED.
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
39 39 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Wed 04/09 3:54 PM
Stipulation By LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL, DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL and Between Plaintiffs to Extend Deadline to File Reply with Certificate of Service Filed by JOSEPH P. GARIN on behalf of LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL, DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL Related [+] (GARIN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, Defendant DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL, Defendant GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL.
Friday, April 04, 2025
38 38 answer Reply Fri 04/04 5:36 PM
Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service Filed by JOHN S MICHELA on behalf of STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION Related [+] (MICHELA, JOHN)
Related: [-] 32 Opposition filed by Plaintiff SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED.
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
37 37 court Minute Entry - Hearing Vacated Per Court Instructions (BK) Wed 04/02 4:53 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 4/16/2025 9:30 AM. Vacated Per Court Instructions. Amended Motion Filed. Docket 28 Related [+] (pal)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL, DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL
Thursday, March 27, 2025
36 36 answer Opposition Thu 03/27 8:28 AM
Amended Opposition to Defendants Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP's, Dan Waite's and Glen J. Light's Amended Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Corrected Caption) with Certificate of Service Filed by STEVEN K EISENBERG on behalf of SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED Related [+] (EISENBERG, STEVEN)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, Defendant DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL, Defendant GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL,33 Opposition filed by Plaintiff SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED,34 Notice of Docketing Error.
35 35 answer Opposition Thu 03/27 8:26 AM
Amended Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Filed by State of Nevada ex rel Nevada Gaming Commission (Corrected Caption) with Certificate of Service Filed by STEVEN K EISENBERG on behalf of SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED Related [+] (EISENBERG, STEVEN)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Defendant STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION,32 Opposition filed by Plaintiff SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED,34 Notice of Docketing Error.
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
34 34 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Tue 03/25 1:18 PM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 32 Opposition filed by Plaintiff SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED,33 Opposition filed by Plaintiff SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED.
Monday, March 24, 2025
33 33 answer Opposition Mon 03/24 10:37 PM
Opposition to Defendants Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP's, Dan Waite's and Glen J. Light's Amended Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service Filed by STEVEN K EISENBERG on behalf of SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED Related [+] (EISENBERG, STEVEN)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, Defendant DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL, Defendant GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL.
32 32 answer Opposition Mon 03/24 10:34 PM
Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Filed by State of Nevada ex rel Nevada Gaming Commission with Certificate of Service Filed by STEVEN K EISENBERG on behalf of SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED Related [+] (EISENBERG, STEVEN)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Defendant STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION.
Sunday, March 02, 2025
31 31 notice Notice (Adv) Sun 03/02 9:47 AM
Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation with Certificate of Service Filed by JOSEPH P. GARIN on behalf of LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL, DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL (GARIN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
30 30 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Mon 02/10 9:19 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 4/16/2025 at 09:30 AM at GS Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, Defendant DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL, Defendant GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL.
Friday, February 07, 2025
29 29 notice Hearing (Adv) Fri 02/07 3:24 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 04162025 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. with Certificate of Service Filed by JOSEPH P. GARIN on behalf of LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL, DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL Related [+](GARIN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, Defendant DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL, Defendant GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL.
28 28 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 02/07 3:21 PM
Amended Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to NRS 41.660 (Anti-SLAPP) with Certificate of Service Filed by JOSEPH P. GARIN on behalf of LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL, DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL Related [+] (GARIN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, Defendant DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL, Defendant GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL.
27 27 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Fri 02/07 9:38 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, Defendant DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL, Defendant GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL.
26 26 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Fri 02/07 9:37 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 4/16/2025 at 09:30 AM at GS Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, Defendant DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL, Defendant GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL.
Thursday, February 06, 2025
25 25 notice Hearing (Adv) Thu 02/06 4:06 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 04/16/2025 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. with Certificate of Service Filed by JOSEPH P. GARIN on behalf of LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL, DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL Related [+](GARIN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, Defendant DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL, Defendant GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL.
24 24 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/06 3:58 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to NRS 41.660 (Anti-SLAPP) with Certificate of Service Filed by JOSEPH P. GARIN on behalf of LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL, DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL (GARIN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
23 23 notice Hearing (Adv) Mon 02/03 1:58 PM
Notice of Hearing Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Hearing Date: 04/16/2025 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. with Certificate of Service Filed by JOHN S MICHELA on behalf of STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION Related [+](MICHELA, JOHN)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Defendant STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION.
Sunday, February 02, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sun 02/02 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 02/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order (BNC)
Friday, January 31, 2025
21 21 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Fri 01/31 4:24 PM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 4/16/2025 at 09:30 AM at GS Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (mah)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Defendant STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION.
20 20 orderad Scheduling Order (BNC) Fri 01/31 3:51 PM
Scheduling Order (BNC) Status Hearing to be held on 4/16/2025 at 09:30 AM at GS Zoom Teleconference Line Related [+] (mah)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED,17 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Defendant STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION.
19 19 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Fri 01/31 11:47 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (jow)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of Hearing filed by Defendant STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION.
Thursday, January 30, 2025
18 18 notice Hearing (Adv) Thu 01/30 4:38 PM
Notice of Hearing for Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Hearing Date: 04/16/2025 Hearing Time: 1:30 p.m. with Certificate of Service Filed by JOHN S MICHELA on behalf of STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION Related [+](MICHELA, JOHN)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Defendant STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION.
17 17 motion Dismiss Party Thu 01/30 4:32 PM
Motion to Dismiss Party State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Gaming Commission Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service Filed by JOHN S MICHELA on behalf of STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION (MICHELA, JOHN)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Thu 01/30 1:39 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 01/30/2025 09:30 am. Continued. Related [+] Appearances: STEVEN KEITH EISENBERG, JOSEPH P. GARIN, JOHN S MICHELA Scheduling Conference scheduled for 04/16/2025 at 09:30 AM at GS Zoom Teleconference Line. (mag)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED
Sunday, January 19, 2025
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 01/19 2:20 PM
First Amended Complaint (corrected to include case number) Filed by STEVEN K EISENBERG on behalf of SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED against all defendants (EISENBERG, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
14 14 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Fri 01/17 9:11 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 13 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED.
Thursday, January 16, 2025
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/16 7:21 PM
First Amended Complaint (Corrected to remove formatting error) Filed by STEVEN K EISENBERG on behalf of SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED against all defendants (EISENBERG, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/16 6:34 PM
Amended Complaint Filed by STEVEN K EISENBERG on behalf of SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED against all defendants (EISENBERG, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
11 11 motion Dismiss Party (BK) Thu 01/02 4:58 PM
Motion to Dismiss Party State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Gaming Commission with Certificate of Service Filed by JOHN S MICHELA on behalf of STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION (MICHELA, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
10 10 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/16 4:31 PM
Summons Service Executed on STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION 12/6/2024 Filed by MATTHEW L SHARP on behalf of SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED Related [+] (SHARP, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED.
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/16 4:30 PM
Summons Service Executed on STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION 12/9/2024 Filed by MATTHEW L SHARP on behalf of SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED Related [+] (SHARP, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED.
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/16 4:28 PM
Summons Service Executed on GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL 12/9/2024 Filed by MATTHEW L SHARP on behalf of SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED Related [+] (SHARP, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED.
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/16 4:27 PM
Summons Service Executed on DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL 12/9/2024 Filed by MATTHEW L SHARP on behalf of SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED Related [+] (SHARP, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED.
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/16 4:26 PM
Summons Service Executed on LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP 12/6/2024 Filed by MATTHEW L SHARP on behalf of SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED Related [+] (SHARP, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED.
Monday, December 02, 2024
5 5 court Summons Issued Mon 12/02 4:20 PM
Amended Summons Issued on PHILIP KONSTAM, AN INDIVIDUAL , LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP , GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL , STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION , MICHAEL VENNER, AN INDIVIDUAL , DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL , ANDREW WATT, AN INDIVIDUAL (ccc)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Mon 12/02 4:19 PM
Summons Issued on PHILIP KONSTAM, AN INDIVIDUAL , LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP , GLENN J. LIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL , STATE OF NEVADA EX REL. NEVADA GAMING COMMISSION , MICHAEL VENNER, AN INDIVIDUAL , DAN R. WAITE, AN INDIVIDUAL , ANDREW WATT, AN INDIVIDUAL (ccc)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Mon 12/02 4:19 PM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/30/2025 at 09:30 AM at GS Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SBC NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, THE ESTATE OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED.
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
2 2 crditcrd Auto-docket of online payment Wed 11/27 11:22 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint([LINK 24-01179 gs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A22115019, fee amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/27 11:18 PM
Adversary case 24-01179 Complaint Filed by SBC Nevada LLC, individually and for the claims for the Estate of Miomni Gaming Limited vs. LEWIS ROCA ROTHBERBER CHRISTIE LLP, Dan R White, Glenn J Light, ANDREW WATT, MICHAEL VENNER, PHILLIP KONSTAM, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Gaming Commission Fee Amount $350. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(EISENBERG, STEVEN)
Related: [-]