Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00367
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 29, 2024 2:22 AM EST
Defendant
Madeline Beveridge (1)
Represented By
Brandon Alexander Thomas
The Law Office Of Brandon A. Thomas
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Annalise Kathleen Peters
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/29/2024 3:51 AM EST
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
1 1 3 pgs INFORMATION, with Forfeiture Provision, as to Madeline Beveridge (1) count(s) 1. (ddm)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Defendant entered a negotiated plea of guilty to sole Count 1 as charged in the Information, with all counts as charged in 1:24-cr-0077-SCJ to be dismissed upon sentencing. Defendant to remain on bond pending sentencing, with all terms and condition of release as previously entered in 1:24-cr-0077-SCJ to remain in full force and effect. (Court Reporter Viola Zborowski) (ddm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 17 pgs Guilty Plea and Plea Agreement
3 3 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Madeline Beveridge. (ddm)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs NOTICE OF SENTENCING Set as to Madeline Beveridge for 2/26/2025 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (ddm)
Related: [-]