Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Case #: 6:24-mj-00397
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Terminated:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 29, 2024 2:40 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kevin Gross
Us Attorney (oked)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
713 US-59, apartment 7, Heavener, OK 74937 (1)
Terminated: 11/26/2024


Docket last updated: 11/29/2024 6:14 AM CST
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
1 1 APPLICATION for Search and Seizure Warrant by USA as to 713 US-59, apartment 7, Heavener, OK 74937 (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]