Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-mj-02093
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 29, 2024 1:29 AM CST
Defendant
Sergio Nunez de Caceres-Benavides (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Juan Jose Becerra
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Alexis Reyes-Andrade (2)
Represented By
Anthony Jalili
Jalili Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alexa Dinsmore Parcell
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/29/2024 3:04 AM CST
Monday, November 25, 2024
Arrest of Sergio Nunez de Caceres-Benavides, Alexis Reyes-Andrade, filed. (df7)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE, PRELIMINARY HEARING, AND DETENTION HEARING on Criminal Complaint as to Sergio Nunez de Caceres-Benavides held on 11/26/2024. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant present in the courtroom. Defendant informed of legal rights, including the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. Federal Public Defender appointed to represent Defendant. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Defendant, through counsel, waived both the Preliminary and Detention Hearings. The Court entered findings, on the record, and found probable cause. The Court also entered findings that Defendant was a flight risk and denied bond; a written order to follow. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally admonished the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; a written order to follow. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Robert Guerra, AUSA; Eva Rocio Fa'Alogo. (Court Reporter:, AFPD) (USPO: Ana Melara) (ERO: Jennifer Nogueira) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Cristina Helmerichs, used) (DUSM: Jonathan Buban). (df7)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE, PRELIMINARY HEARING, AND DETENTION HEARING on Criminal Complaint as to Alexis Reyes-Andrade held on 11/26/2024. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant present in the courtroom. Defendant informed of legal rights, including the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. The Court appointed counsel to represent the defendant, and counsel, Anthony Jalili, was present for the proceedings. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Defendant, through counsel, waived both the Preliminary and Detention Hearings. The Court entered findings, on the record, and found probable cause. The Court also entered findings that Defendant was a flight risk and denied bond; a written order to follow. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally admonished the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; a written order to follow. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Robert Guerra, AUSA. (USPO: Ana Melara) (ERO: Jennifer Nogueira) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Cristina Helmerichs, used) (DUSM: Jonathan Buban). (df7)
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Alexa Dinsmore Parcell appearing for USA, filed. (Parcell, Alexa)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Juan Jose Becerra, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Sergio Nunez de Caceres-Benavides, filed. (Becerra, Juan)
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Sergio Nunez de Caceres-Benavides, Alexis Reyes-Andrade, filed. Initial Appearance set for 11/26/2024 at 09:01 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. (df7)
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Sergio Nunez de Caceres-Benavides, filed. (df7)
Related: [-]
3 3 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Alexis Reyes-Andrade, filed. (df7)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Sergio Nunez de Caceres-Benavides (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (df7)
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Sergio Nunez de Caceres-Benavides. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (df7)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Alexis Reyes-Andrade. Anthony Jalili appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (df7)
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Alexis Reyes-Andrade. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (df7)
Related: [-]
8 8 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Sergio Nunez de Caceres-Benavides, filed.
Related: [-]
9 9 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Alexis Reyes-Andrade, filed.
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Alexis Reyes-Andrade ( Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (le7)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Sergio Nunez de Caceres-Benavides ( Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (le7)
Related: [-]