Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-03529
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 29, 2024 1:35 AM CST
Defendant
Pedro Diaz-Martinez (1)
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 11/29/2024 3:13 AM CST
Monday, November 25, 2024
Arrest of Pedro Diaz-Martinez (drda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez. (drda)
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez. (drda)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez (1).By Judge Joseph A Cordova. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez. (drda)
Related: [-]