Hawaii District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-01192
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Nov 28, 2024 9:35 PM HST
Defendant
Brian Micah Easterling (1)
Represented By
Melinda K. Yamaga
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Wayne A. Myers
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/28/2024 11:26 PM HST
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT; AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Brian Micah Easterling (1) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 11/26/2024. (jni)
Related: [-]
2 2 EO: as to Brian Micah Easterling - An Initial Appearance is set for 11/29/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER) (ab)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Detain by USA as to Brian Micah Easterling. (Myers, Wayne)
Related: [-]