Oklahoma Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-00867
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 29, 2024 1:17 AM CST
Defendant
Alonzo De La Cruz (1)
Represented By
Kyle E Wackenheim
Federal Public Defender-Okc
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Nicholas M Coffey
Us Attorney'S Office-Okc
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/29/2024 2:42 AM CST
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
Arrest of Alonzo De La Cruz in Western District of Oklahoma. (rb)
Related: [-]
1 1 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Alonzo De La Cruz (rb)
Related: [-]
2 2 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Alonzo De La Cruz (rb)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Kyle E Wackenheim for Alonzo De La Cruz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 11/27/2024. (rb)
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) as to Alonzo De La Cruz held on 11/27/2024. Defendant requests detention hearing in the charging district. (rb)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings by Alonzo De La Cruz (rb)
Related: [-]
6 6 DPPA-ORDER as to Alonzo De La Cruz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 11/27/2024. (rb)
Related: [-]
7 7 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Alonzo De La Cruz. Defendant committed to District of Western District of Texas. Case terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 11/27/2024. (rb)
Related: [-]
8 8 Notice to Western District of Texas of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Court Documents as to Alonzo De La Cruz. Your case number is: PE:22-CR-627. Docket sheet and documents attached. If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to newcases@okwd.uscourts.gov. (rb)
Related: [-]
9 9 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kyle E Wackenheim appearing for Alonzo De La Cruz (Wackenheim, Kyle)
Related: [-]