Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00224
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 29, 2024 1:21 AM CST
Defendant
Octavio Vargas-Gomez (1)
Represented By
Jeffrey J Morgan
Lebell Dobroski & Morgan LLP
contact info
Ramuel R Figueroa
Federal Defender Services Of Wisconsin Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Philip Thomas Kovoor
United States Department Of Justice (ed-Wi)
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/29/2024 2:49 AM CST
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
Arrest of Octavio Vargas-Gomez (mlm)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin as to Octavio Vargas-Gomez. (lz)
Related: [-]
2 2 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT - BOND STUDY ( Restricted ) filed by US Pretrial Office as to Octavio Vargas-Gomez ( NOTICE: Counsel for the defendant is required to provide a copy of this document to the defendant. Parties allowed to view this document may do so by logging in. ) (at)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin: Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint as to Octavio Vargas-Gomez held on 10/23/2024. Spanish interpreter via Zoom sworn. Defendant advised of rights charges, penalties, and fines. Government requests three day hold. Court orders defendant temporarily detained and sets Detention Hearing for October 24, 2024 at 2:30 PM in courtroom 242 before Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin. The court ORDERS that pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) the government must produce all exculpatory information to the defendant(s) as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings. (Court Reporter Liberty) (amb)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION and Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Octavio Vargas-Gomez signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/23/2024. Detention Hearing set for 10/24/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 242, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. (cc: all counsel) (amb)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ramuel R Figueroa appearing for Octavio Vargas-Gomez as Federal Public Defender (Figueroa, Ramuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin: Detention Hearing as to Octavio Vargas-Gomez held on 10/24/2024. Interpreter present and sworn. Govt argued for detention. Deft argued for release. Deft is ordered detained pending trial. Preliminary Hearing / Arraignment & Plea set for 11/7/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 242, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. (Tape #Liberty 2:29-2:49 pm) (lz)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Octavio Vargas-Gomez signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/24/2024. (cc: all counsel) (lz)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey J Morgan appearing for Octavio Vargas-Gomez as Retained Counsel (Morgan, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
9 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Octavio Vargas-Gomez: The court is satisfied that the defendant is financially unable to obtain counsel and the appointment of counsel is in the interest of justice; Ramuel Figueroa appointed effective 10/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 11/6/2024. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
10 10 Minute Entry for Preliminary Hearing held on 11/7/2024 before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin as to Octavio Vargas-Gomez. Defendants waives his right to a preliminary hearing and signs the form. (Tape #10:59:54-11:02:00) (mlm)
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Octavio Vargas-Gomez (mlm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
12 12 INFORMATION as to Octavio Vargas-Gomez (1) count 1. (lz) (lz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/27/2024) Information Sheet
13 13 15 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to Octavio Vargas-Gomez (Kovoor, Philip)
Related: [-]