New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:24-cv-10830
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2024
Terminated:Apr 17, 2025
Case in other court:New Jersey Superior Court, MID L 006090 24
Last checked: Monday Jan 13, 2025 3:46 AM EST
Defendant
BRANDI GANNAWAY
Represented By
DENISE MERNA DADIKA
Epstein, Becker & Green, PC
contact info
JIRI JANKO
Epstein Becker & Green PC
contact info
Defendant
LASERAWAY MEDICAL GROUP, INC.
Represented By
DENISE MERNA DADIKA
Epstein, Becker & Green, PC
contact info
JIRI JANKO
Epstein Becker & Green PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ALEXIS CONROY
Represented By
PETER D. VALENZANO
Mccomber Mccomber & Luber, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Thu 04/17 3:52 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 4/17/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Thu 04/17 10:36 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by ALEXIS CONROY. (VALENZANO, PETER)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 04/17 3:57 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
14 14 1 pgs misc Letter Fri 04/04 5:04 PM
Letter from Peter D. Valenzano, Esq. re6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay This Action . (VALENZANO, PETER)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 04/07 7:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Settlement Conference held on 4/4/2025. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
13 13 order Order Thu 04/03 5:18 PM
TEXT ORDER: Tomorrow's settlement conference will proceed at 11:00 a.m., rather than 10:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/3/2025. (MAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
12 12 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 03/05 11:07 AM
TEXT ORDER: In light of counsel's request11 , the Virtual Settlement Conference on 3/10/2025 is adjourned to 4/4/2025 at 10:00 a.m. before the Undersigned. In addition to counsel, parties or their representatives with full and complete authority to resolve all pending federal litigation between these parties must also appear via Teams, no exceptions. Failure to produce an appropriate client representative may result in adjournment of the settlement, and the imposition of fees or sanctions against the non-complying party. Each party shall mail a tabbed confidential settlement memorandum to the Undersigned by 3/27/2025. The settlement memorandum may not exceed five double-spaced pages, excluding exhibits. Any video or audio files must be submitted via a USB. The USB must be clearly marked with the case name and docket number, and the identity of the party. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/5/2025. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
11 11 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 03/04 11:18 AM
Letter from Denise M. Dadika re 10 Text Order,,,, Set Hearings,,,. (DADIKA, DENISE)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
10 10 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 03/03 9:54 AM
TEXT ORDER: There will be a Virtual Settlement Conference on 3/10/2025 at 11:00 a.m. before the Undersigned. In addition to counsel, parties or their representatives with full and complete authority to resolve all pending federal litigation between these parties must also appear via Teams, no exceptions. Failure to produce an appropriate client representative may result in adjournment of the settlement, and the imposition of fees or sanctions against the non-complying party. Each party shall mail a tabbed confidential settlement memorandum to the Undersigned by 3/7/2025. The settlement memorandum may not exceed five double-spaced pages, excluding exhibits. Any video or audio files must be submitted via a USB. The USB must be clearly marked with the case name and docket number, and the identity of the party. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/3/2025. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 order Text Order Thu 02/20 8:52 AM
TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the In-Person Settlement Conference is adjourned without a new date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/20/2025. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
8 8 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 01/10 9:22 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' January 7, 2025 joint letter, D.E. 7. There shall be an in-person settlement conference in the Courtroom of the Undersigned on March 13, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. In addition to counsel of record, clients, or their representative with full and complete authority to resolve all aspects of this matter must appear and be present in-person for the conference. Not later than February 27, 2025, each party shall submit a hard copy confidential settlement memorandum to the Undersigned's chambers. The settlement memorandum may not exceed five (5) double-spaced pages, and any accompanying exhibits must be tabbed for ease of reference. Any video or audio files must be submitted via a USB. The USB must be clearly marked with the case name and docket number, and the identity of counsel. Further, the parties joint request to adjourn the deadlines for the motion to compel arbitration is granted. The return date for the motion to compel arbitration is adjourned to April 7, 2025. Defendants' Opposition to the motion to compel will be due March 24, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/10/25. (tad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
7 7 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 01/07 2:44 PM
Letter. (VALENZANO, PETER)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/30 1:16 PM
Set Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay This Action . Motion set for 1/21/2025 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
6 6 motion Compel Arbitration Fri 12/20 10:21 AM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay This Action by LASERAWAY MEDICAL GROUP, INC., BRANDI GANNAWAY.(DADIKA, DENISE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support,
Att: 2 Certification Certification of D. Dadika,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Certification of D. Dadika,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Certification of D. Dadika,
Att: 5 Certification Mault Certification with Exhibits,
Att: 6 Certification Napier Certification,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Form of Order
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
5 5 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 12/03 6:08 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by LASERAWAY MEDICAL GROUP, INC., BRANDI GANNAWAY. (JANKO, JIRI)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/03 6:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JIRI JANKO on behalf of All Defendants (JANKO, JIRI)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 12/02 11:36 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 12/02 11:38 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BRANDI GANNAWAY, LASERAWAY MEDICAL GROUP, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/20/2024. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
3 3 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 11/29 2:14 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to LaserAway Medical Group, Inc. and Brandi Gannaway.. (DADIKA, DENISE)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 11/29 2:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LASERAWAY MEDICAL GROUP, INC.. (DADIKA, DENISE)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs notice Notice of Removal Fri 11/29 1:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LASERAWAY MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15840167), filed by LASERAWAY MEDICAL GROUP, INC..(DADIKA, DENISE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 53 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 9 Certification Certification pursuant to Local Civil Rule 11.2
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Sun 12/01 9:17 AM
Case assigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
Related: [-]