Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Tilman E Self, III
Case #: 3:24-cv-00124
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2024
Terminated:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 15, 2025 4:02 AM EST
Defendant
INSURIFY INSURANCE AGENCY INC
Plaintiff
SARA TAYLOR
Represented By
STEVEN H KOVAL
contact info
ANTHONY I PARONICH
contact info


Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/21 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SARA TAYLOR as to All Defendants (PARONICH, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
utility REMARK Mon 04/21 3:09 PM
REMARK : In light of10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, this case has been closed. (aen)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 03/03 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by SARA TAYLOR(PARONICH, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/14 5:19 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until March 3, 2025. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 2/14/2025 (vs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 02/13 8:26 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by INSURIFY INSURANCE AGENCY INC filed by PATRICK J FITZGERALD.(FITZGERALD, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
6 6 misc Stipulation Mon 02/03 2:02 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time re1 Complaint by INSURIFY INSURANCE AGENCY INC (FITZGERALD, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/04 10:03 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SARA TAYLOR as to INSURIFY INSURANCE AGENCY INC. (PARONICH, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
4 4 misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Mon 12/02 12:31 PM
Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ANTHONY I PARONICH. (ksl)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/02 12:25 PM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of SARA TAYLOR Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4811282, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Steven H. Koval Georgia Bar No. 428905.(PARONICH, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 12/02 9:02 AM
Summons Issued as to INSURIFY INSURANCE AGENCY INC. (aen)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement Mon 12/02 8:59 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL ANTHONY I. PARONICH - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements .(aen)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 01, 2024
1 1 misc Complaint Sun 12/01 8:36 PM
COMPLAINT against INSURIFY INSURANCE AGENCY INC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4810644, $405 filed by SARA TAYLOR(KOVAL, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons