California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:24-cv-02595
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2024
Terminated:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 2:41 AM PST
Defendant
Raisa Aeliana
2266 Synergy
Irvine, CA 92614
Defendant
Juan Gomez Delgado
Plaintiff
Yu Zhang
Represented By
Enhan Cao
Di Li Law, P.C.
contact info
Li Yang
Di Li Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
12 12 misc Mail Returned Mon 03/24 12:06 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Raisa Aeliana re Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court8 (twdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
13 13 misc Mail Returned Mon 03/24 12:21 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Raisa Aeliana re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18)4 (twdb)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Mail Returned Thu 03/20 5:40 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Raisa Aeliana re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form6 (LATE DOCKETING DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) (jji)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
14 14 misc Mail Returned Mon 03/24 12:25 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Raisa Aeliana re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge6 (twdb)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Mail Returned Thu 03/20 5:32 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Raisa Aeliana re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form5 (LATE DOCKETING DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) (jji)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
16 16 misc Mail Returned Mon 03/24 12:29 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Raisa Aeliana re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18)4 (twdb)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Mail Returned Mon 03/24 12:28 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Raisa Aeliana re Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)7 (twdb)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Mail Returned Thu 03/20 5:27 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Raisa Aeliana re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form5 (LATE DOCKETING DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) (jji)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
8 8 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Mon 12/02 4:53 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court. (twdb)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Mon 12/02 4:47 PM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (NON-PRISONER CASE). This case is REMANDED to state court as explained in the attached statement. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 01, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Sun 12/01 7:55 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Sun 12/01 7:54 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Sun 12/01 7:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Sun 12/01 7:52 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Raisa Aeliana. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Sun 12/01 7:51 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Raisa Aeliana, identifying Other Affiliate Anna Brunello, Other Affiliate Raisa Aeliana for Raisa Aeliana. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Sun 12/01 7:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Orange, case number 30-02024 01393590-CL-UD-CJC with CONFORMED E-FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth., filed by Defendant Raisa Aeliana.. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet