California Northern District Court
Judge:Eumi K Lee
Case #: 5:24-cv-08598
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2025 12:49 AM PST
Defendant
City of Marina
211 Hillcrest Avenue
Marina, CA 93933
Represented By
Rene Alejandro Ortega
Shute, Mihaly & Weinberger LLP
contact info
Matthew Dwight Zinn
Shute, Mihaly & Weinberger
contact info
Shanthi M. Chackalackal
Shute, Mihaly & Weinberger LLP
contact info
Defendant
Transportation Agency of Monterey County
55-B Plaza Circle
Salinas, CA 93901
Represented By
Madonna Ann Herman
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Peter Christopher Catalanotti
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Museum of Handcar Technology LLC
26911 Ruether Ave, #P
Canyon Country, CA 91351
Represented By
Anthony Salaber
Downey Brand LLP
contact info
Galen Micah Gentry
Downey Brand LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
93 93 order Order Wed 05/14 7:50 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a response to the 90 Motion to Shorten Time by 5/15/2025. In its response, Plaintiff shall propose an alternate hearing date and briefing schedule for the 84 Motion to Vacate, in the event that the Court decides to advance the hearing on that motion currently set for 7/15/2025. Entered by Judge Eumi K. Lee on 5/14/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ekllc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
92 92 motion Shorten Time Tue 05/13 4:45 PM
MOTION to Shorten Time Proposed Order filed by Transportation Agency for Monterey County. (Mills, Heather)
Related: [-]
91 91 motion Shorten Time Tue 05/13 4:44 PM
MOTION to Shorten Time Declaration of Heather L. Mills in Support Of filed by Transportation Agency for Monterey County. (Mills, Heather)
Related: [-]
90 90 motion Shorten Time Tue 05/13 4:43 PM
MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Transportation Agency for Monterey County. (Mills, Heather)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
89 89 motion Vacate Mon 05/12 7:49 PM
MOTION to Vacate Notice of Withdrawal filed by Transportation Agency for Monterey County. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2025 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Eumi K Lee. Responses due by 5/27/2025. Replies due by 6/3/2025. (Mills, Heather)
Related: [-]
88 88 motion Vacate Mon 05/12 7:01 PM
MOTION to Vacate Proposed Order filed by Transportation Agency for Monterey County. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2025 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Eumi K Lee. Responses due by 5/27/2025. Replies due by 6/3/2025. (Mills, Heather)
Related: [-]
87 87 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 05/12 6:53 PM
Declaration of Todd Muck filed byTransportation Agency for Monterey County.(Mills, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
86 86 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 05/12 6:48 PM
Declaration of Lisa Rheinheimer filed byTransportation Agency for Monterey County.(Mills, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit S,
Att: 20 Exhibit T,
Att: 21 Exhibit U,
Att: 22 Exhibit V,
Att: 23 Exhibit W,
Att: 24 Exhibit X,
Att: 25 Exhibit Y,
Att: 26 Exhibit Z,
Att: 27 Exhibit AA,
Att: 28 Exhibit BB,
Att: 29 Exhibit CC,
Att: 30 Exhibit DD,
Att: 31 Exhibit EE
85 85 motion Vacate Mon 05/12 6:32 PM
MOTION to Vacate filed by Transportation Agency for Monterey County. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2025 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Eumi K Lee. Responses due by 5/27/2025. Replies due by 6/3/2025.(Mills, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
84 84 motion Vacate Mon 05/12 6:28 PM
MOTION to Vacate filed by Transportation Agency for Monterey County. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2025 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Eumi K Lee. Responses due by 5/27/2025. Replies due by 6/3/2025. (Mills, Heather)
Related: [-]
83 83 motion Vacate Mon 05/12 4:51 PM
MOTION to Vacate filed by Transportation Agency for Monterey County, City of Marina. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2025 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Eumi K Lee. Responses due by 5/27/2025. Replies due by 6/3/2025.(Mills, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
82 82 motion Vacate Mon 05/12 4:42 PM
MOTION to Vacate filed by Transportation Agency for Monterey County, City of Marina. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2025 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Eumi K Lee. Responses due by 5/27/2025. Replies due by 6/3/2025. (Mills, Heather)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
81 81 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/07 4:18 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT & SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Eumi K. Lee on 5/7/2025. (lrt, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
80 80 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial Wed 05/07 3:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eumi K Lee: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/7/2025. Case management & scheduling order to issue. Pursuant to the Court's 79 Order, discovery is stayed as to the City of Marina. Plaintiff and the City agree to meet and confer with respect to discovery of Mayor Delgado in his role as TAMC board member. A hearing on the TAMC's anticipated motion to vacate the preliminary injunction is reserved for July 15, 2025, at 1:30 p.m., in person. Plaintiff Attorney: Galen Gentry, Zachary Streiff. Defendant Attorney: Heather Mills, Makala Furse; Matthew Zinn, Shanthi Chackalackal. Zoom recording, 1:41pm-2:13pm (32 minutes). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/7/2025)
Related: [-]