Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Ross
Case #: 4:24-cv-01592
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 16, 2025 3:31 AM CST
Defendant
LDK Precision Contracting, LLC
Represented By
Michael E. Kaemmerer
Mccarthy Leonard Lc
contact info
William C. Jarvis
Mccarthy Leonard Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
33 33 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Fri 04/18 1:03 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant LDK Precision Contracting, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Related [+] Signed by Sr. District Judge John A. Ross on 4/18/2025. (TLR)
Related: [-] sponse to Court due by 5/21/2025.
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/18 10:45 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant LDK Precision Contracting, LLC. (Jarvis, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
31 31 respm Statement of Material Facts Mon 03/31 10:11 AM
STATEMENT of Material Facts re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
30 30 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 03/31 10:10 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan.(Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of John Tierney,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1A to Tierney Aff,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1B to Tierney Aff,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 to Tierney Aff,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3A to Tierney Aff,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3B to Tierney Aff,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 to Tierney Aff,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 to Tierney Aff,
Att: 9 Affidavit of Brad Soderstrom,
Att: 10 Exhibit 1 to Soderstrom Aff
29 29 motion Summary Judgment Mon 03/31 10:08 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
28 28 order Case Management Order Mon 03/03 2:18 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Motion to Join Parties due by 4/1/2025. Discovery Completion due by 8/19/2025. ADR Future Reference 8/1/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2025. Jury Trial set for 2/23/2026 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before Sr. District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2026 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before Sr. District Judge John A. Ross). Signed by Sr. District Judge John A. Ross on 3/3/2025. (LNJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
27 27 misc Joint Scheduling Plan Wed 02/26 2:20 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan. . (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
26 26 order Rule 16 Order Wed 02/19 1:35 PM
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: No later than February 26, 2025, counsel shall file with the Clerk of the Court a joint proposed scheduling plan. This case is assigned to Track: 2. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/26/2025.) Signed by Sr. District Judge John A. Ross on 2/19/2025. (TLR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
25 25 order A Docket Text Order Tue 02/18 8:43 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re: MOTION to Withdraw16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Sr. District Judge John A. Ross on 2/18/2025. (TLR)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Tue 02/18 12:03 PM
***REMARK: Sent a follow-up email to Defense counsel regarding the filing of disclosure statement. (LNJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
24 24 motion Withdraw Mon 02/17 1:12 PM
MOTION to Withdraw16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/11 11:52 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant LDK Precision Contracting, LLC.(Jarvis, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Daniel Klemm
Friday, February 07, 2025
22 22 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Fri 02/07 9:55 AM
THIRD Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant LDK Precision Contracting, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
21 21 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Fri 01/31 2:33 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 Memorandum in Support of Motion,16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant LDK Precision Contracting, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Related [+] Signed by Sr. District Judge John A. Ross on 1/31/2025. (LNJ)
Related: [-] sponse to Court due by 2/7/2025.
Thursday, January 30, 2025
20 20 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Thu 01/30 11:04 AM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant LDK Precision Contracting, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (LNJ)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 01/30 10:39 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant LDK Precision Contracting, LLC. (Jarvis, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/29 11:28 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, by LDK Precision Contracting, LLC.(Jarvis, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
17 17 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 01/15 2:17 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan.(Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of John Tierney,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1A to Tierney Aff,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1B to Tierney Aff,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 to Tierney Aff
16 16 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 01/15 2:16 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
15 15 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Fri 01/10 2:39 PM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant LDK Precision Contracting, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (LNJ)
Related: [-]
14 14 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Fri 01/10 2:38 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Defendant LDK Precision Contracting, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. (LDK Precision Contracting, LLC answer due 1/29/2025). Signed by Sr. District Judge John A. Ross on 1/10/2025. (LNJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/09 9:43 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,,, by Defendant LDK Precision Contracting, LLC. (Jarvis, William)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 01/09 9:16 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by William C. Jarvis for Defendant LDK Precision Contracting, LLC. (Jarvis, William)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 01/09 9:15 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Michael E. Kaemmerer for Defendant LDK Precision Contracting, LLC. (Kaemmerer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/18 3:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Board of Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan. All Defendants. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Mon 12/09 11:35 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Mon 12/09 11:34 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Mon 12/09 11:33 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Mon 12/09 11:32 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Mon 12/09 11:31 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Mon 12/09 11:30 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Mon 12/09 11:28 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
2 2 service Notice of Process Server Mon 12/02 10:45 AM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/02 10:44 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-10962982, in the amount of $405 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Board of Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Plan, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Vacation Plan, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Training Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Health Plan.(Campbell, Greg) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/2/2024 due to incorrect case number in caption of document) (JWD). Modified on 12/2/2024 (JWD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Original Filing Form,
Att: 3 Summons
misc Case Opening Notification Mon 12/02 1:36 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Greg A. Campbell. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]