Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-21777

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Stacey L Meisel
Case #: 2:24-ap-01633
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2024
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ayyaz Ahmed
116 Boonton Ave
Kinnelon, NJ 07405
Represented By
Ayyaz Ahmed
contact info
Defendant
Aysha Khan
116 Boonton Ave
Kinnelon, NJ 07405
Represented By
Aysha Khan
contact info
Defendant
Prestige Infusions, LLC
116 Boonton Avenue
Kinnelon, NJ 07405
Represented By
Prestige Infusions, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Lush Floral and Events, LLC
116 Boonton Avenue
Kinnelon, NJ 07405
Represented By
Lush Floral and Events, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Golden Healthcare LLC d/b/a Golden Healthcare Pharmacy
242 Palisade Avenue, Suite A
Garfield, NJ 07026
Represented By
Golden Healthcare LLC d/b/a Golden Healthcare Pharmacy
contact info
Defendant
Oak Hills Medical Building Pharmacy a/k/a Oak Hills Pharmacy, Inc.
7711 Louis Pasteur Drive
San Antonio, TX 78229
Represented By
Oak Hills Medical Building Pharmacy a/k/a Oak Hills Pharmacy, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Deltona Medical Arts Pharmacy, Inc. d/b/a Apex Health Rx
1200 Deltona Blvd., Suite 50
Deltona, FL 32725
Represented By
Deltona Medical Arts Pharmacy, Inc. d/b/a Apex Health Rx
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Forman, Chapter 7 Trustee
365 West Passaic Street Suite 400
Rochelle ParK, NJ 07662
Represented By
Kimberly J. Salomon
Forman Holt
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
court Notice of Returned Mail Wed 05/07 3:37 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Notice Recipient's Address on Envelope Returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center: Deltona Medical Arts Pharmacy, Inc. d/b/a Apex Hea 1200 Deltona Blvd., Suite 50 Deltona, FL 32725-6386 , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 18 BNC Certificate of Notice
Friday, April 25, 2025
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice (generic) Sat 04/26 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
17 17 court Transcript Thu 04/17 5:00 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 12/12/24 Related [+]. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/24/2025. List of Items to be Redacted Due By 05/8/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 05/19/2025. Remote electronic access to the transcript will be restricted through 07/16/2025. (J&J Court Transcribers)
Related: [-] 5 Order to Show Cause (Upload)
Thursday, March 06, 2025
court Notice of Returned Mail Mon 03/10 8:48 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Notice Recipient's Address on Envelope Returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center: Golden Healthcare LLC d/b/a Golden Healthcare Phar 242 Palisade Avenue, Suite A Garfield, NJ 07026-2967 , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 15 Order (Generic)
Monday, February 10, 2025
court Hearing Held Mon 02/10 11:36 AM
Minute of Hearing Scheduled, OUTCOME: Consent Judgment Signed and Entered Related [+] (omf) Modified on 2/10/2025 to correct spelling (OMF)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued to Charles M. Forman for Service on Ayyaz Ahmed Answer due on 1/2/2025; Deltona Medical Arts Pharmacy, Inc. d/b/a Apex Health Rx Answer due on 1/2/2025; Golden Healthcare LLC d/b/a Golden Healthcare Pharmacy Answer due on 1/2/2025; Aysha Khan Answer due on 1/2/2025; Lush Floral and Events, LLC Answer due on 1/2/2025; Oak Hills Medical Building Pharmacy a/k/a Oak Hills Pharmacy, Inc. Answer due on 1/2/2025; Prestige Infusions, LLC Answer due on 1/2/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 2/11/2025 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attachment)
utility Close Adversary Case Mon 02/10 11:42 AM
Adversary Case (2:24-ap-1633) Closed. (omf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
court Notice of Returned Mail Mon 01/06 10:15 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: The attached document was mailed to the notice recipient(s) listed below via the U.S. Postal Service, and it was returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center as undeliverable. This notification is being sent for appropriate processing as your court may determine. Notice Recipient's Address on Envelope Returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center: Deltona Medical Arts Pharmacy, Inc. d/b/a Apex Hea 1200 Deltona Blvd., Suite 50 Deltona, FL 32725-6386 , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 15 Order (Generic)
Thursday, January 02, 2025
court Notice of Returned Mail Mon 01/06 10:14 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: The attached document was mailed to the notice recipient(s) listed below via the U.S. Postal Service, and it was returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center as undeliverable. This notification is being sent for appropriate processing as your court may determine. Notice Recipient's Address on Envelope Returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center: Oak Hills Medical Building Pharmacy a/k/a Oak Hill 7711 Louis Pasteur Drive San Antonio, TX 78229-3415 , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 15 Order (Generic)
Friday, December 27, 2024
court Notice of Returned Mail Mon 01/06 8:48 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Notice Recipient's Address on Envelope Returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center: Deltona Medical Arts Pharmacy, Inc. d/b/a Apex Hea 1200 Deltona Blvd., Suite 50 Deltona, FL 32725-6386 , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 5 Order to Show Cause (Upload)
Thursday, December 26, 2024
court Notice of Returned Mail Fri 01/03 12:11 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Notice Recipient's Address on Envelope Returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center: Deltona Medical Arts Pharmacy, Inc. d/b/a Apex Hea 1200 Deltona Blvd., Suite 50 Deltona, FL 32725-6386 , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic)
Thursday, December 19, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 12/20 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 12/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
court Notice of Returned Mail Fri 01/03 12:06 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Notice Recipient's Address on Envelope Returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center: Oak Hills Medical Building Pharmacy a/k/a Oak Hill 7711 Louis Pasteur Drive San Antonio, TX 78229-3415 , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 5 Order to Show Cause (Upload)
court Notice of Returned Mail Fri 01/03 12:08 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Notice Recipient's Address on Envelope Returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center: Oak Hills Medical Building Pharmacy a/k/a Oak Hill 7711 Louis Pasteur Drive San Antonio, TX 78229-3415 , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic)
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
15 15 6 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 12/17 2:03 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT EXTENDING PROCEEDINGS AND FOR RELATED RELIEF Related [+]
Related: [-] 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CHAPTER 7 CASE SHOULD NOT BE EXTENDED TO THE BUSINESS ENTITIES AND GRANTING TEMPORARY RELIEF,14 Certification Concerning Proposed Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/17/2024. (ntp
14 14 misc Certification Concerning Proposed Order Tue 12/17 9:37 AM
Certification Concerning Proposed Order Related [+]. Filed by Kimberly J. Salomon on behalf of Charles M. Forman, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Salomon, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CHAPTER 7 CASE SHOULD NOT BE EXTENDED TO THE BUSINESS ENTITIES AND GRANTING TEMPORARY RELIEF. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/3/2024. Show Cause hearing to be held on 12/5/2024 at 02:00 PM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
court Notice of Returned Mail Fri 01/03 12:03 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Notice Recipient's Address on Envelope Returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center: Golden Healthcare LLC d/b/a Golden Healthcare Phar 242 Palisade Avenue, Suite A Garfield, NJ 07026-2967 , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 5 Order to Show Cause (Upload)
Thursday, December 12, 2024
court Hearing Held Thu 12/12 2:34 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Consent Order to be Submitted Related [+] (omf)
Related: [-] 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CHAPTER 7 CASE SHOULD NOT BE EXTENDED TO THE BUSINESS ENTITIES AND GRANTING TEMPORARY RELIEF. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/3/2024. Show Cause hearing to be held on 12/5/2024 at 02:00 PM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
13 13 misc Certification Concerning Proposed Order Wed 12/11 4:45 PM
Certification Concerning Proposed Order Related [+]
Related: [-] 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CHAPTER 7 CASE SHOULD NOT BE EXTENDED TO THE BUSINESS ENTITIES AND GRANTING TEMPORARY RELIEF. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/3/2024. Show Cause hearing to be held on 12/5/2024 at 02:00 PM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp),7 AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CHAPTER 7 CASESHOULD NOT BE EXTENDED TO THE BUSINESS ENTITIES AND GRANTINGTEMPORARY RELIEF (related document:5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CHAPTER 7 CASE SHOULD NOT BE EXTENDED TO THE BUSINESS ENTITIES AND GRANTING TEMPORARY RELIEF. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/5/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2024 at 09:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)). Filed by Kimberly J. Salomon on behalf of Charles M. Forman, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Salomon, Kimberly
Saturday, December 07, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 12/08 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 12/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/06 4:34 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Kimberly J. Salomon on behalf of Charles M. Forman, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Salomon, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic)
10 10 motion Shorten Time Fri 12/06 2:41 PM
(FILED IN INCORRECT ADV. PROCEEDING. PLEASE SEE 24-01636 Application to Shorten Time Related [+] Filed by Ayyaz Ahmed, Aysha Khan. (LVJ) Modified TEXT on 12/6/2024 (LVJ)
Related: [-] 9 Motion re: Notice of Motion to Amend Order/Emergency Hearing filed by Defendant Aysha Khan, Defendant Ayyaz Ahmed
9 9 motion Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Fri 12/06 2:31 PM
(FILED IN INCORRECT ADV. PROCEEDING. PLEASE SEE 24-01636 Motion re: Notice of Motion to Amend Order/Emergency Hearing Filed by Ayyaz Ahmed, Aysha Khan. (LVJ) Modified TEXT on 12/6/2024 (lvj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Certification Response of Defendants
Att: 3 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
court Hearing Scheduled (Document) Fri 12/06 2:36 PM
(FILED IN INCORRECT ADV. PROCEEDING. PLEASE SEE 24-01636 Emergency Hearing Scheduled. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 12/6/2024 at 02:40 PM VIA COURT-SOLUTIONS at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (LVJ) Modified on 12/6/2024 (lvj). Modified on 12/6/2024 (Veloz-Jimenez, Lucy)
Related: [-] 9 Motion re: Notice of Motion to Amend Order/Emergency Hearing Filed by Ayyaz Ahmed, Aysha Khan. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Certification Response of Defendants # 3 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary # 4 Proposed Order # 5 Certificate of Service) (LVJ) filed by Defendant Aysha Khan, Defendant Ayyaz Ahmed
court Hearing Held Fri 12/06 3:46 PM
(FILED IN INCORRECT ADV. PROCEEDING. PLEASE SEE 24-01636 . Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Emergency relief ordered from the bench, written order will be entered when submitted. Related [+] (omf)
Related: [-] 9 Motion re: Notice of Motion to Amend Order/Emergency Hearing Filed by Ayyaz Ahmed, Aysha Khan. (Attachments: #1 Certification #2 Certification Response of Defendants #3 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary #4 Proposed Order #5 Certificate of Service) Filed by Defendant Ayyaz Ahmed, Defendant Aysha Khan
Thursday, December 05, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 12/06 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 12/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 4 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 12/05 5:00 PM
AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CHAPTER 7 CASESHOULD NOT BE EXTENDED TO THE BUSINESS ENTITIES AND GRANTINGTEMPORARY RELIEF Related [+]
Related: [-] 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CHAPTER 7 CASE SHOULD NOT BE EXTENDED TO THE BUSINESS ENTITIES AND GRANTING TEMPORARY RELIEF. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/5/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2024 at 09:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf
court Hearing Held and Continued Thu 12/05 4:01 PM
Minute of Hearing Held. OUTCOME: Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2024 at 09:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)
Related: [-] 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CHAPTER 7 CASE SHOULD NOT BE EXTENDED TO THE BUSINESS ENTITIES AND GRANTING TEMPORARY RELIEF. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/3/2024. Show Cause hearing to be held on 12/5/2024 at 02:00 PM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/04 10:46 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Kimberly J. Salomon on behalf of Charles M. Forman, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Salomon, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01633 Complaint by Charles M. Forman, Chapter 7 Trustee against Ayyaz Ahmed ; Aysha Khan ; Prestige Infusions, LLC ; Lush Floral and Events, LLC ; Golden Healthcare LLC d/b/a Golden Healthcare Pharmacy ; Oak Hills Medical Building Pharmacy a/k/a Oak Hills Pharmacy, Inc. ; Deltona Medical Arts Pharmacy, Inc. d/b/a Apex Health Rx. Receipt Number EST ACCT, Fee Amount $ 350.. (91 (Declaratory judgment)) filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, Chapter 7 Trustee,2 Application for Order to Show Cause re: Extending the Chapter 7 Case to the Business Entiities and Granting Temporary Relief Filed by Charles M. Forman, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law # 2 Certification of Charlles M. Forman in Support # 3 Exhibit A to Certification # 4 Exhibit B to Certification # 5 Exhibit C to Certification # 6 Exhibit D to Certification # 7 Exhibit E to Certification # 8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Certification # 9 Certification of Kimberly J. Salomon in Support # 10 Proposed Order to Show Cause) filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, Chapter 7 Trustee,5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CHAPTER 7 CASE SHOULD NOT BE EXTENDED TO THE BUSINESS ENTITIES AND GRANTING TEMPORARY RELIEF. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/3/2024. Show Cause hearing to be held on 12/5/2024 at 02:00 PM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
5 5 order Show Cause (Upload) Tue 12/03 2:36 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CHAPTER 7 CASE SHOULD NOT BE EXTENDED TO THE BUSINESS ENTITIES AND GRANTING TEMPORARY RELIEF. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/3/2024. Show Cause hearing to be held on 12/5/2024 at 02:00 PM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Tue 12/03 8:56 AM
Summons Issued to Charles M. Forman for Service on Ayyaz Ahmed Answer due on 1/2/2025; Deltona Medical Arts Pharmacy, Inc. d/b/a Apex Health Rx Answer due on 1/2/2025; Golden Healthcare LLC d/b/a Golden Healthcare Pharmacy Answer due on 1/2/2025; Aysha Khan Answer due on 1/2/2025; Lush Floral and Events, LLC Answer due on 1/2/2025; Oak Hills Medical Building Pharmacy a/k/a Oak Hills Pharmacy, Inc. Answer due on 1/2/2025; Prestige Infusions, LLC Answer due on 1/2/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 2/11/2025 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachment
Monday, December 02, 2024
3 3 misc Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee Mon 12/02 1:00 PM
Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee filed by Kimberly J. Salomon on behalf of Charles M. Forman, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Salomon, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Show Cause Mon 12/02 12:45 PM
Application for Order to Show Cause re: Extending the Chapter 7 Case to the Business Entiities and Granting Temporary Relief Filed by Charles M. Forman, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Salomon, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
Att: 2 Certification of Charlles M. Forman in Support
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Certification
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Certification
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Certification
Att: 6 Exhibit D to Certification
Att: 7 Exhibit E to Certification
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Certification
Att: 9 Certification of Kimberly J. Salomon in Support
Att: 10 Proposed Order to Show Cause
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/02 12:20 PM
Adversary case 24-01633 Complaint by Charles M. Forman, Chapter 7 Trustee against Ayyaz Ahmed ; Aysha Khan ; Prestige Infusions, LLC ; Lush Floral and Events, LLC ; Golden Healthcare LLC d/b/a Golden Healthcare Pharmacy ; Oak Hills Medical Building Pharmacy a/k/a Oak Hills Pharmacy, Inc. ; Deltona Medical Arts Pharmacy, Inc. d/b/a Apex Health Rx. Receipt Number EST ACCT, Fee Amount $ 350.. (91 (Declaratory judgment)) (Salomon, Kimberly)
Related: [-]