Florida Middle District Court
Judge:James S Moody, Jr
Referred: Natalie Hirt Adams
Case #: 8:24-cv-02784
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2003 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2024
Terminated:Jan 30, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 16, 2025 4:26 AM EST
Defendant
TD Synnex Corporation
Represented By
Dawn Siler-Nixon
Fordharrison Llp - Tampa
contact info
Plaintiff
Shaista S. Rasheed
Represented By
Denise Mutamba
Mdm Legal, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 30, 2025
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 01/30 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/30 8:56 AM
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 9 Notice of Settlement. All pending motions, if any, are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/30/2025. (SMB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of settlement Wed 01/29 6:09 PM
NOTICE of settlement by TD Synnex Corporation (Siler-Nixon, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/30 3:28 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. TD Synnex Corporation's deadline to answer or respond to the Complaint is extended to January 29, 2025. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/30/2024. (SMB)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 12/30 2:51 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by TD Synnex Corporation. (Siler-Nixon, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
6 6 service Proof of service Thu 12/12 11:08 AM
RETURN of Service Executed on 12/9/2024 as to TD Synnex Corporation by Shaista S. Rasheed (Mutamba, Denise) Modified text on 12/12/2024 (BD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 12/03 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Denise Mutamba on behalf of Shaista S. Rasheed. Lead Counsel: Denise Mutamba. (Mutamba, Denise)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons issued Tue 12/03 11:43 AM
SUMMONS issued as to TD Synnex Corporation. (MSN)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 12/03 11:29 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Denise A. Mutamba of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MSN)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 12/03 8:57 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:24-cv-02784-JSM-NHA. (AA)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/02 5:03 PM
COMPLAINT against TD Synnex Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22774163) filed by Shaista Rasheed.(Mutamba, Denise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons