New York Northern District Court
Judge:Lawrence E Kahn
Referred: Daniel J Stewart
Case #: 1:24-cv-01453
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 16, 2025 4:18 AM EST
Defendant
Albany Police Department
Represented By
Stephen J. Rehfuss
The Rehfuss Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
City of Albany
Represented By
Stephen J. Rehfuss
The Rehfuss Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Janae Timmons
Represented By
Steven T. Sledzik
Morrison Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
14 14 misc Letter Brief Fri 05/02 2:13 PM
LETTER BRIEF Status Letter by Janae Timmons. (Sledzik, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
13 13 order Order Removing Case from ADR Thu 04/03 5:03 PM
TEXT ORDER Removing Case from ADR Program, in response to12 . SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 4/3/2025. (spl)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Letter Brief Thu 04/03 8:48 AM
LETTER BRIEF Regarding ADR Referral by Janae Timmons. (Sledzik, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
11 11 order Uniform Pretrial Scheduling Order Mon 03/03 10:47 AM
UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 4/2/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 4/2/2025. Rule 26 disclosures to be exchanged by 3/24/2025. Discovery due by 11/19/2025. Plaintiff Expert Disclosure Deadline is 8/21/2025. Defendant Expert Disclosure Deadline is 10/6/2025. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 10/20/2025. Motions to be filed by 2/13/2026. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 10/24/2025. Status Report (from Plaintiff or filed jointly) due by 5/2/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/3/2025. (spl)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mandatory Mediation Mon 03/03 10:30 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 4/03/2025. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 10/24/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/3/2025. (spl)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 03/03 10:23 AM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/03/2025 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart: Court hears from counsel as to their current positions and how they intend to proceed in this matter. Court discusses potential for settlement. The Court discusses the Mandatory Mediation Program with counsel. Scheduling Order deadlines set. A Uniform Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. Counsel may contact the Court if any issues arise after attempting to resolve them without intervention of the Court. [Appearances: Steven Sledzik, Esq. for Plaintiff; Stephen Rehfuss for Defendant. Time: 9:55-10:10 AM] (spl)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 misc Civil Case Management Plan Mon 02/24 9:49 AM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Janae Timmons. (Sledzik, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/12 2:12 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by City of Albany, Albany Police Department Related [+]
Related: [-] hfuss, Stephen
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/12 2:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen J. Rehfuss on behalf of City of Albany, Albany Police Department Related [+]
Related: [-] hfuss, Stephen
Friday, December 06, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/06 9:36 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Assignment and Filing Order by Regular Mail served on City of Albany, Albany Police Department on 12/5/24, filed by Janae Timmons. (Sledzik, Steven)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/06 9:34 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summon and Complaint served on Confidential Secretary Heavenly Morris on 12/5/24, filed by Janae Timmons. (Sledzik, Steven)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/06 9:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Officer Steven Silver on 12/5/24, filed by Janae Timmons. (Sledzik, Steven)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 12/06 9:57 AM
***Answer due date updated for Albany Police Department answer due 12/26/2024; City of Albany answer due 12/26/2024. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Mon 12/02 4:07 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/3/2025 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/24/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mmg)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 12/02 4:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Albany Police Department, City of Albany. (mmg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/02 4:04 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Albany Police Department, City of Albany (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6949293) filed by Janae Timmons.(mmg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet