Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Susan O Hickey
Case #: 5:24-cv-05245
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 16, 2025 3:13 AM CST
Defendant
Board of Trustees for University of Arkansas
Represented By
C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
University Of Arkansas
contact info
Plaintiff
Victor Wilson
Represented By
Michael J Laux
Michael J. Laux
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Sunday, March 09, 2025
8 8 17 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Sun 03/09 8:47 PM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Board of Trustees for University of Arkansas.(Cordi, C.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
7 7 22 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/16 12:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to2 Complaint, against Board of Trustees for University of Arkansas , filed by Victor Wilson. Related document:2 Complaint, filed by Victor Wilson.(Laux, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/16 12:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Victor Wilson. Board of Trustees for University of Arkansas was sent waiver on 1/9/2025, answer due 3/10/2025.(Laux, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-EXECUTED WAIVER OF SUMMONS
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
5 5 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/14 8:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by C. Joseph Cordi, Jr on behalf of Board of Trustees for University of Arkansas. (Cordi, C.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 12/27 3:45 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Board of Trustees for University of Arkansas and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (bjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
3 3 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Tue 12/03 11:31 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form provided. (ria)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 12/02 4:26 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Board of Trustees for University of Arkansas ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AARWDC-3095415), filed by Victor Wilson.(Laux, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-RIGHT TO SUE LETTER,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-INTENT TO HIRE LETTER,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-JOB OFFER LETTER,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-NDP JOB TITLE/DESCRIPTION
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/02 3:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Victor Wilson. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (ria)
Related: [-]