Washington Western District Court
Judge:Thomas S Zilly
Case #: 2:24-cv-01981
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 16, 2025 1:36 AM PST
Defendant
Infinity Solar LLC
Represented By
Jason Michael Rosenbaum
Chenoweth Law Group (or)
contact info
Defendant
Solar Canary LLC
Plaintiff
Freedom Forever Washington LLC
Represented By
Blake Edward Marks-Dias
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jordan C. Bledsoe
Foley & Lardner Llp (ut)
contact info
Tanner Brad Camp
Foley & Lardner Llp (ut)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 04/17 9:18 AM
Attorneys Jonathan J. Doucette and William T Cornell added for Defendant Infinity Solar LLC; per27 Notice of Attorney Association. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
28 28 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 04/16 2:55 PM
ANSWER to20 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Freedom Forever Washington LLC.(Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Attorney Association Thu 04/10 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Daniel W Rankin on behalf of Defendant Infinity Solar LLC. (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Fri 03/28 2:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Parties' Stipulated Protective Order, docket no.24 , is ADOPTED in full by the Court. The Parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Counterclaim, docket no.25 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant Infinity Solar LLC's counterclaim is EXTENDED to 4/16/2025. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
25 25 motion Extension of Time-Other Thu 03/27 2:08 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaim , filed by Plaintiff Freedom Forever Washington LLC, Counter Defendant Freedom Forever Washington LLC. Noting Date 3/27/2025, (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Protective Order Thu 03/27 1:59 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff Freedom Forever Washington LLC, Counter Defendant Freedom Forever Washington LLC. Noting Date 3/27/2025, (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
23 23 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 03/27 11:19 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court finds this case is appropriate for mediation under Local Civil Rule 39.1. The parties are directed to conduct mediation upon completion of discovery. A settlement conference pursuant to Local Civil Rule 39.1(c)(2) must be completed by June 8, 2026. Mediation shall be completed no later than July 8, 2026, and a letter of compliance shall be filed with the Court no later than July 15, 2026. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
22 22 order TSZ Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates(FORM) Tue 03/25 5:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Length of Trial: *10 days*. Jury Trial is set for 9/21/2026 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2026, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/2/2026, Discovery motions due by 4/23/2026, Discovery completed by 6/1/2026, Dispositive motions due by 7/2/2026, Motions related to expert witnesses due by 7/9/2026, Motions in Limine due by 8/28/2026, Pretrial Order due by 9/4/2026, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/4/2026, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/4/2026, and Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2026 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
21 21 misc Joint Status Report Mon 03/17 3:30 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: Ten. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
20 20 cmp Counterclaim Amended Answer to Complaint Wed 03/12 4:54 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Plaintiff Freedom Forever Washington LLC., COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Freedom Forever Washington LLC (Rosenbaum, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
19 19 misc Jury Demand Tue 03/04 3:10 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Infinity Solar LLC (Rosenbaum, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
18 18 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 02/19 5:23 PM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Infinity Solar LLC.(Rosenbaum, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Tue 02/04 4:16 PM
ORDER by Clerk Ravi Subramanian granting11 Motion for Default by Plaintiff Freedom Forever Washington LLC against Defendant Solar Canary LLC. (RM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Fri 01/17 3:57 PM
Attorney Brian D. Chenoweth added for Defendant Infinity Solar LLC; per16 Praecipe to Attach Document. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
16 16 misc Praecipe to Attach Document Thu 01/16 3:29 PM
PRAECIPE to attach document (Notice of Appearance) re14 Notice of Appearance by Defendant Infinity Solar LLC (Rosenbaum, Jason)
Related: [-]
notice Notice re Lack of Proper Signature Thu 01/16 1:41 PM
NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The14 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by Brian D Chenoweth . As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with LCR 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with[LINK:ECF Filing Procedures] . Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
15 15 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 01/15 5:06 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Infinity Solar LLC. (Rosenbaum, Jason)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason Michael Rosenbaum on behalf of Defendant Infinity Solar LLC. (Rosenbaum, Jason)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/15 9:47 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Infinity Solar LLC, Solar Canary LLC with JURY DEMAND filed by Freedom Forever Washington LLC.(Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 01/15 12:41 PM
Plaintiff Freedom Forever Washington LLC's and Defendant TML International LLC dba Infinity Solar USA's telephonic request for extension is GRANTED. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/3/2025; Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/17/2025; Joint Status Report due by 3/17/2025. The deadline for Defendant TML International LLC dba Infinity Solar USA to file a responsive pleading or motion is EXTENDED to February 19, 2025. (RM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
12 12 respm Declaration Tue 01/14 4:11 PM
DECLARATION of Tanner Camp filed by Plaintiff Freedom Forever Washington LLC re11 MOTION for Default against Solar Canary LLC,(Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
11 11 motion Default Tue 01/14 4:09 PM
MOTION for Default against Solar Canary LLC,, filed by Plaintiff Freedom Forever Washington LLC. Noting Date 1/14/2025, (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
10 10 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Tue 01/07 3:59 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Infinity Solar, LLC on 12/31/2024, filed by Plaintiff Freedom Forever Washington LLC. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
9 9 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Thu 12/12 3:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Solar Canary LLC on 12/10/2024, filed by Plaintiff Freedom Forever Washington LLC. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Thu 12/12 11:54 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly: Joint Status Report due by 2/10/2025, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/27/2025, and Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/10/2025. (RM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 12/11 10:42 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Infinity Solar LLC. (SB)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 12/06 12:32 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to all Defendants. (MIH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 12/06 12:10 PM
Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (MIH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 12/06 1:52 PM
Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. Judge Barbara J. Rothstein Related [+] no longer assigned to case. (MIH)
Related: [-] cusal
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
5 5 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/04 1:30 PM
ORDER re3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorneys Jordan C. Bledsoe, and Tanner Brad Camp for Plaintiff Freedom Forever Washington LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
4 4 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/03 12:31 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tanner B. Camp FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Freedom Forever Washington LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8741224 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/03 12:24 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jordan C. Bledsoe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Freedom Forever Washington LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8741199 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
2 2 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 12/02 4:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Freedom Forever Washington LLC. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/02 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Related [+] filed by Freedom Forever Washington LLC.(Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8739805
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons