California Central District Court
Judge:Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:24-cv-10370
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause09:0009 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2024
Terminated:Jan 06, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 16, 2025 1:20 AM PST
Petitioner
Andrei Cherny
Represented By
Justin H Sanders
Sanders Roberts LLP
contact info
Oluwatobi N. Agbelemose
Sanders Roberts LLP
contact info
Respondent
Aspiration Partners, Inc.


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 03, 2025
7 7 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 01/03 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Petitioner Andrei Cherny. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Sanders, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
6 6 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 01/02 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Petitioner Andrei Cherny. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Sanders, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
5 5 1 pgs notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 12/03 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Andrei Cherny, identifying Aspiration Partners Inc.; Catona Climate; Andrei Cherny. (Sanders, Justin)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Tue 12/03 9:04 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (sh)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Tue 12/03 9:02 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 12/02 4:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Andrei Cherny. (Sanders, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 240 pgs cmp Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 12/02 4:23 PM
PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award Receipt No: ACACDC-38678962 - Fee: $405, filed by Petitioner Andrei Cherny. (Attorney Justin H Sanders added to party Andrei Cherny(pty:pet))(Sanders, Justin)
Related: [-]