Vanessa LeMaistre v. Leland T. Wayne
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-10378 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 16, 2025 1:22 AM PST |
Defendant
Leland T. Wayne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanessa LeMaistre
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
35 | 35
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/12 1:23 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting34 Non-Resident Attorney Molly Zhu APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff, designating Vanessa LeMaistre as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak) |
|
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Molly Zhu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vanessa LeMaistre (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 5/8/2025, Receipt No. 39664668) filed by Plaintiff Vanessa LeMaistre. (Bengali, Omar) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
33 | 33
![]() NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Molly Zhu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vanessa LeMaistre (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39664668)32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Not signed. (ak) |
|
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
32 | 32
![]() APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Molly Zhu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vanessa LeMaistre (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39664668) filed by Plaintiff Vanessa LeMaistre. (Bengali, Omar) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
31 | 31
![]() ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: Granting Stipulation for Physical Examination of Plaintiff30 . GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, and pursuant to the parties' Stipulation, the Court hereby approves and grants the Stipulation For Physical Examination of Plaintiff Vanessa Lemaistre. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See attached) (edr) |
|
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
30 | 30
![]() STIPULATION for Order filed by Defendant Leland T. Wayne.(Hinkle, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
29 | 29
![]() MINUTES OF ZOOM DISCOVERY HEARING27 by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: The case was called for an informal discovery conference ("IDC") by Zoom. Counsel for the parties made their video appearances. The Court and the parties discussed the pending discovery disputes as set forth in the parties' joint email to the Court dated April 1, 2025. (See document for further details) (edr) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
28 | 28
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 04/03 12:26 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE - Text Only - ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver re: MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE27 previously scheduled for 4/4/2025 10:00 AM has been rescheduled. Motion RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE set for hearing on 4/4/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Clerk to email parties video link. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (edr) |
|
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
![]() MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE: The parties have requested an informal discovery conference with Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Counsel for each party has submitted their respective positions and the issue will be adjudicated in accordance with the Magistrate Judge's procedures. Scheduled for 4/4/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Clerk to email parties video link. (See attached)(edr) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/12 4:07 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting25 Non-Resident Attorney Bobby L. Daniels, Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Leland T. Wayne, designating Lawrence Curtis Hinkle II as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bobby L. Daniels, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Leland T. Wayne (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 2/5/2025, Receipt No. 39051637) filed by Defendant Leland T. Wayne. (Hinkle, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Saturday, February 08, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bobby L. Daniels, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Leland T. Wayne (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39051637)21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Pro hac vice counsel does not show any address outside the state for the practice of law (ak) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: re Stipulation for Protective Order22 . (edr) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Leland T. Wayne.(Hinkle, Lawrence) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bobby L. Daniels, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Leland T. Wayne (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39051637) filed by Defendant Leland T. Wayne. (Hinkle, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, January 27, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than July 25, 2025. (jre) |
|
19 | 19
![]() ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2025 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Jury Trial set for 9/23/2025 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
18 | 18
![]() MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2025. Discovery cut-off 6/24/2025. Motions due by 7/8/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2025 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Jury Trial set for 9/23/2025 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (jre) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Vanessa LeMaistre.. (Willemin, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/17/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 12/13 3:24 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting10 Non-Resident Attorney Monica Hincken APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Vanessa LeMaistre, designating Omar Bengali as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak) |
|
14 | 14
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 12/13 3:18 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting9 Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Willemin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Vanessa LeMaistre, designating Omar Bengali as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak) |
|
13 | 13
![]() ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Leland T. Wayne.(Sanders, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, December 11, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-10378 RGK(RAOx). (rn) |
|
10 | 10
![]() APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Monica Hincken to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vanessa LeMaistre (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38731331) filed by Plaintiff Vanessa LeMaistre. (Bengali, Omar) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Willemin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vanessa LeMaistre (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38731174) filed by Plaintiff Vanessa LeMaistre. (Bengali, Omar) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
textonly
MJDAP Timely Opt-Out
Tue 12/10 7:00 AM
Declination of Consent form received on 12/9/2024 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bem) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Leland T. Wayne, identifying Vanessa LeMaistre, Leland T. Wayne. (Sanders, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney MONICA HINCKEN. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Willemin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (sh) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Leland T. Wayne. (Sanders, Justin) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 24STCV29310 Receipt No: ACACDC-38679884 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Leland T. Wayne. (Attorney Justin H Sanders added to party Leland T. Wayne(pty:dft))(Sanders, Justin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Wed 12/04 2:32 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Leland T. Wayne. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Vanessa LeMaistre. [FILED IN STATE COURT 10/29/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |