Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Referred: Russell G Vineyard
Case #: 1:24-cv-05498
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (other)
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 16, 2025 4:28 AM EST
Defendant
Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Henry
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Sibdhannie
443 Kara Lane
McDonough, GA 30253


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 3:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Henry. Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Henry waiver mailed on 4/17/2025, answer due 6/16/2025. (Miller, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
8 8 service Request for Waiver of Service Thu 04/17 2:15 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service (2 Notices of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, 2 Waiver of Service of Summons forms, 1 copy of the Amended Complaint, 1 copy of the Service Order, 1 copy of the Initial Disclosures form, and 1 Self-Addressed Stamped Envelope) mailed to Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Henry on 4/17/2025. If waiver not returned by 5/22/2025, prepare personal service package. (ane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 03/04 4:16 PM
Submission of5 Order to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (ane)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
7 7 utility Remark Tue 03/04 3:53 PM
USM 285 Form and Proposed Summons received for Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Henry (Incomplete Forms - No return address for Plaintiff listed on Summons and USM form) (ane)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Initial Disclosures Tue 03/04 3:40 PM
Initial Disclosures by Elizabeth Sibdhannie.(ane)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
5 5 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Directing Service by Clerk Mon 02/10 2:52 PM
ORDER: The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to send plaintiff the USM 285 form, summons, and initial disclosures form. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to complete the USM 285 form, summons, and initial disclosures form, and to return one for defendant within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order. Upon receipt of forms, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a service waiver package for Defendant. In the event a Defendant does not return the Waiver of Service form to the Clerk of Court within Thirty-five(35) days following the date the service waiver package was mailed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshal's Service a service package for the Defendant who failed to return the waiver form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 2/10/2025. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Forms Sent Mon 02/10 2:54 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Elizabeth Sibdhannie re5 Order. Forms sent to party: USM 285; Summons; Initial Disclosures. (ane)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/17 4:18 PM
Submission of4 Amended Complaint to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (sap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/17 1:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Henry filed by Elizabeth Sibdhannie.(tas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
3 3 cmp Complaint Mon 12/30 12:35 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Elizabeth Sibdhannie.(ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 14 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 12/30 12:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send plaintiff a new employment discrimination form complaint and she is hereby ORDERED to replead her complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order to address the deficiencies discussed herein. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon plaintiff's filing of an amended complaint or the expiration of fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 12/30/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Forms Sent Mon 12/30 12:39 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Elizabeth Sibdhannie re2 Order. Forms sent to party: Employment Discrimination Complaint form. (ane)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 12/02 3:13 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elizabeth Sibdhannie.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 12/02 3:14 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisto Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (ajw)
Related: [-]