Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:David C Joseph
Referred: Carol B Whitehurst
Case #: 6:24-cv-01629
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
14 14 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Wed 04/09 10:08 AM
OBJECTION to12 Report and Recommendations by Joshua Paul Galloway. Response to Objection to R&R due by 4/22/2025.(crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, March 28, 2025
13 13 order Judgment re Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations Fri 03/28 8:02 AM
JUDGMENT adopting12 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against Unknown Officers, Mark Garber and the Lafayette Police Department be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this civil action, claims of civil rights violations against Sr. Cpl. Fontenot and Cpl. Mcfarlain, is STAYED and the clerk of court should administratively close this case until further order of the court. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 3/28/2025. (crt,LaCombe, L) (Main Document 13 replaced on 3/28/2025) (LaCombe, L)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Fri 03/28 8:03 AM
Case Stayed. See Judgment entered 3/28/2025. (crt,LaCombe, L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
12 12 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 03/13 3:48 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Joshua Paul Galloway. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiffs claims against Unknown Officers, Mark Garber and the Lafayette Police Department be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that this civil action, claims of civil rights violations against Sr. Cpl. Fontenot and Cpl. Mcfarlain, is STAYED and the clerk of court should administratively close this case until further order of the court. This case will remain closed until such time as Plaintiff might file a motion to lift stay after the completion of his criminal proceedings. If Plaintiff files such motion, he will have to show that the litigations of the claims presented in this case would not run afoul of Heck or that the Heck conditions (charges dismissed or any conviction reversed or set aside) have been met. Objections to R&R due by 3/27/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/13/2025. (crt,Jordan, P)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
11 11 order Minute Entry/Order Reassigning Case Wed 02/26 3:44 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge David C Joseph. Judge Robert R Summerhays no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. (crt,Alexander, E)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 02/25 11:24 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL: IT IS ORDERED that this matter is referred to Chief Judge Terry Doughty for reassignment to another judge in accordance with the Court's Standing Order 1.62. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 2/25/2025. (crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/24 12:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ricky Fontenot, Kevin Mcfarlain filed by Joshua Paul Galloway.(crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, January 24, 2025
8 8 order Sec P - Order Amend/ARP/Summons/Timely Fri 01/24 3:27 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER directing plaintiff to amend his complaint. Pro Se Response due by 3/5/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/24/2025. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/03 3:47 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $10.00. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/3/2025. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Fri 01/03 3:41 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/3/2025. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/02 10:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joshua Paul Galloway. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/27/2024.(crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope,
Att: 2 Proposed order
Thursday, December 12, 2024
4 4 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 12/13 8:26 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Joshua Paul Galloway. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst.(crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
3 3 order Sec P - Deficiency Order Wed 12/11 10:37 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 1/10/2025). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 12/5/2024.(crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ifp form
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
2 2 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Tue 12/03 1:55 PM
PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/3/2024. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/02 2:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Mark Garber, Police Dept of Lafayette filed by Joshua Paul Galloway.(crt,Williams, K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 12/03 1:49 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]