Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence G Berg
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:24-cv-13207
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 5:00 AM EST
Defendant
DocNetwork, Inc
Represented By
Kevin F. O'Shea
Miller Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Elise Spencer
Represented By
Nicholas Roumel
Roumel Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 06, 2025
6 6 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 03/06 2:19 PM
REPLY to Response re4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)1 and (6) filed by DocNetwork, Inc. (O'Shea, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
5 5 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/21 5:10 PM
RESPONSE to4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)1 and (6) filed by Elise Spencer. (Roumel, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
4 4 motion Dismiss Fri 01/31 9:49 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)1 and (6) by DocNetwork, Inc. (O'Shea, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
3 3 notice Appearance Wed 12/04 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin F. O'Shea on behalf of DocNetwork, Inc. (O'Shea, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Wed 12/04 4:17 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *DocNetwork, Inc* (MSyl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Wed 12/04 4:18 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (MSyl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
1 1 9 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 12/03 3:17 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Elise Spencer against Elise Spencer with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10033340 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Lenawee - County Where Action Arose: washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Roumel, Nicholas)
Related: [-]