Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan
Case #: 3:24-cv-01554
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 5:57 AM AST
Defendant
A B C Insurance Companies
Defendant
Chubb Insurance Company
Represented By
Hector Benitez-Arraiza
Benitez Arraiza, PC
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Richard Roe a to z
Defendant
Universal Insurance Company
Represented By
Victor O Acevedo-Hernandez
Casillas, Santiago & Torres, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Luma Energy ServCo, LLC.
1110 Ponce de Len Ave. Pda. 16 1/2 NEOS Building, Suite 607
San Juan, PR 00907
Represented By
Margarita L. Mercado-Echegaray
Dla Piper Puerto Rico (llc)
contact info
Mariana Muniz-Lara
Dla Piper (puerto Rico) LLC
contact info
Daniel Brown-Saenz
Dla Piper (puerto Rico) LLC
contact info
Defendant
Luma Energy, LLC.
1110 Ponce de Len Avenue, Pda. 16 NEOS Building, Suite 607
San Juan, PR 00907
Represented By
Margarita L. Mercado-Echegaray
Dla Piper Puerto Rico (llc)
contact info
Mariana Muniz-Lara
Dla Piper (puerto Rico) LLC
contact info
Daniel Brown-Saenz
Dla Piper (puerto Rico) LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel McBride
Represented By
Francisco L. Charles-Gomez
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
50 50 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 04/22 10:33 AM
ORDER granting:49 "Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-reply at Dockets 45 and 47." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 4/22/2025. (ao)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
49 49 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 04/21 9:47 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to file sur reply at Docket 45 and Docket 47 filed by Francisco L. Charles-Gomez on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/5/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Charles-Gomez, Francisco)
Related: [-]