Minnesota District Court
Judge:John R Tunheim
Referred: Dulce J Foster
Case #: 0:24-cv-04361
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 3:49 AM CST
Defendant
Greystar Management Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Dantel Ruth
Represented By
William L French
William L. French, Attorney At Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Terminated: 12/19/2024


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 03, 2025
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Mon 03/03 2:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dantel Ruth re5 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint,7 Amended Complaint (French, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 01/07 1:03 PM
Summons Issued as to Greystar Management Services, LLC. (MMG)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/06 3:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greystar Management Services, LLC. filed by Dantel Ruth. Filer requests summons issued. (French, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
6 6 5 pgs order Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court Fri 12/20 5:18 PM
ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re Amended Complaint 5 . Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint on or before January 6, 2025 . See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 12/20/2024. (DCC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/19 1:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greystar Management Services, L.P.. filed by Dantel Ruth. Filer requests summons issued. (French, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
4 4 4 pgs order Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court Fri 12/06 9:15 AM
ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re1 Complaint . Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint on or before December 20, 2024 . See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 12/6/2024. (DCC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 12/03 3:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Greystar Management Services, L.P. (MKB)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Tue 12/03 3:29 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 24-cv-4361 (JRT/DJF). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 12/03 1:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Greystar Management Services, L.P. (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11518332) filed by Dantel Ruth. Filer requests summons issued. (French, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet