California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 3:24-cv-08683
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 1:46 AM PST
Defendant
Aehr Test Systems, Inc.
Defendant
Gayn Erickson
Defendant
Chris P. Siu
Plaintiff
Lucid Alternative Fund, LP
Represented By
Jennifer Pafiti
Pomerantz LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
40 40 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/16 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Yue Guo (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
39 39 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/11 8:23 AM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Henry Bloxenheim.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/11 6:40 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20555693.) filed by Lucid Alternative Fund, LP.(Bloxenheim, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
37 37 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 10:14 AM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Baker.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 7:16 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20540171.) filed by Lucid Alternative Fund, LP.(Baker, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, April 04, 2025
35 35 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 04/04 7:42 AM
Order AS AMENDED BY THE COURT by Judge Susan Illston granting 34 Stipulation. Motions due by 6/6/2025. Responses due by 6/27/2025. Replies due by 7/11/2025. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
34 34 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 04/02 4:30 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Yue Guo. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
33 33 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Wed 03/19 5:12 PM
ODER APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL granting 13 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying 17 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. (Illston, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
32 32 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 03/14 2:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held via Zoom webinar before Judge Susan Illston: Motion Hearing held on 3/14/2025 re 13 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Yue Guo, 17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Lucid Alternative Fund, LP. Total Time in Court: 20 Minutes. Court Reporter: April Brott. Plaintiff Attorney: J. Alexander Hood (Lucid), Phillip Kim (Guo). Defendant Attorney: Morgan Whitworth. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/14/2025)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
31 31 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/13 8:06 AM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Phillip Kim.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
30 30 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 03/13 8:00 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARINGS & REGISTRATION: The Motions to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Hearings13 17 set for 3/14/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston. These proceedings will be held via a Public Hearing Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si] MANDATORY ZOOM REGISTRATION: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov IMMEDIATELY. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston. (ec, COURT STAFF). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
29 29 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/12 8:31 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20444331.) filed by Yue Guo. (Kim, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
28 28 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 02/25 6:23 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byLucid Alternative Fund, LP. (Pafiti, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
27 27 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 02/25 2:02 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byYue Guo. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-] 13 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
Friday, February 21, 2025
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/21 8:58 AM
ORDER granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/21/2025. (afm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
24 24 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/20 9:34 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20369429.) filed by Lucid Alternative Fund, LP. (Hood, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order Relating Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 02/20 11:06 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER. Cases Rammohan Prabhakar v. Gayn Erickson, et al , No. 3:24-cv-09236-RFL, and Ingrid Diaz v. Gayn Erickson, et al , No. 4:25-cv-00251-YGR, are related cases and are to be reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/19/2025. (afm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
23 23 8 pgs respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 02/18 5:24 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byYue Guo. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-] 17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
22 22 oth_sup Brief Tue 02/18 3:00 PM
Brief re13 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ,17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Memorandum of Law: (1) in Further Support of Motion of Lucid Alternative Fund, LP for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel; and (2) in Opposition to Competing Motion filed byLucid Alternative Fund, LP. Related [+] (Pafiti, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 13 ,17
Thursday, February 13, 2025
21 21 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Thu 02/13 2:52 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Ingrid Diaz. Responses due by 2/18/2025.(Tramontano, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Alex J. Tramontano,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 06, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 02/06 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Colleen Carlton Smith on behalf of Aehr Test Systems, Inc., Gayn Erickson, Chris P. Siu (Smith, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
19 19 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 02/03 9:09 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Lucid Alternative Fund, LP re17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Pafiti, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Certificate of Counsel Mon 02/03 9:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Jennifer Pafiti on behalf of Lucid Alternative Fund, LP (Pafiti, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Mon 02/03 8:55 PM
MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Lucid Alternative Fund, LP. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 2/18/2025. Replies due by 2/25/2025.(Pafiti, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jennifer Pafiti,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Damages Analysis,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Press Release,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Certification,
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Movant Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit E - Firm Resume
16 16 notice Certificate of Counsel Mon 02/03 7:38 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re13 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Laurence Matthew Rosen on behalf of Yue Guo (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 02/03 7:35 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Yue Guo (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
14 14 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 02/03 7:31 PM
Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen in Support of13 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byYue Guo. Related [+] (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-] 13
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. PSLRA Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2. PSLRA Certification,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3. Loss Chart,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4. Rosen Law Firm Resume
13 13 motion Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Mon 02/03 7:25 PM
MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Yue Guo. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 2/18/2025. Replies due by 2/25/2025.(Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 8 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 02/03 3:55 PM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 11 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference Deadlines.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 02/03 2:59 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint) Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference Deadlines filed by Aehr Test Systems, Inc., Gayn Erickson, Chris P. Siu.(Whitworth, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Morgan E. Whitworth
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 02/03 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Morgan Edwin Whitworth on behalf of Aehr Test Systems, Inc., Gayn Erickson, Chris P. Siu (Whitworth, Morgan)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 02/03 2:50 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Aehr Test Systems, Inc., Gayn Erickson, Chris P. Siu (Blunschi, Melanie)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 02/03 2:41 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Aehr Test Systems, Inc., Gayn Erickson, Chris P. Siu (Blunschi, Melanie)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 02/03 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Melanie Marilyn Blunschi on behalf of Aehr Test Systems, Inc., Gayn Erickson, Chris P. Siu (Blunschi, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/06 11:56 AM
NOTICE by Lucid Alternative Fund, LP Notice of Publication of Notice of Pendency of Action(Pafiti, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Pendency of Action
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 12/04 8:35 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2025 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 12/04 8:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Aehr Test Systems, Inc., Gayn Erickson, Chris P. Siu. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 12/03 1:52 PM
Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 12/03 12:52 PM
Proposed Summons. (Pafiti, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 12/03 12:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Aehr Test Systems, Inc., Gayn Erickson, Chris P. Siu ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20105148.). Filed by Lucid Alternative Fund, LP.(Pafiti, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Schedule A,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet