California Central District Court
Judge:Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:24-cv-02567
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 1:48 AM PST
Defendant
Bellflower Automotive, Inc.
Defendant
Victoria P Moreno
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Deondre Raglin
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 28, 2025
10 10 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 02/28 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Deondre Raglin. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
9 9 textonly MJDAP Opt-Out Expired Thu 02/27 2:48 PM
The period to decline consent to a magistrate judge has expired. No timely declination of consent has been received by the Court. Each party is deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes pursuant to the Local Rules. The case shall now proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
8 8 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 02/12 1:38 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Victoria P Moreno, upon Defendant Victoria P Moreno served on 2/10/2025, answer due 3/3/2025. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 02/12 1:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deondre Raglin, upon Defendant Bellflower Automotive, Inc. served on 2/10/2025, answer due 3/3/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon HECTOR A MORENO, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 12/05 12:47 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Bellflower Automotive, Inc., Victoria P Moreno. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Thu 12/05 12:45 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 12/03 12:53 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Deondre Raglin. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 12/03 12:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 12/03 12:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Deondre Raglin. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 12/03 12:50 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38685275 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Deondre Raglin(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]