Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10680

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jennifer E Niemann
Case #: 1:24-ap-01055
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2024
Terminated:May 05, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Valley Pacific Petroleum Services, Inc.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Irma C. Edmonds
Represented By
Anthony D. Johnston
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 05/05 9:16 AM
Adversary Proceeding 1:24-ap-1055 Closed (wmim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
23 23 misc Matter Held * Thu 04/24 2:42 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Dropped as moot, Resolved without Oral Argument [CAE-1] Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) : Complaint 24-01055 by Irma C. Edmonds against Valley Pacific Petroleum Services, Inc.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7429037) (wmim) (auto)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
22 22 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 04/17 9:12 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
21 21 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 04/15 7:31 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (wmim)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal (Order) Tue 04/15 7:27 AM
Order Granting18 Motion/Application to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal (wmim)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
19 19 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Mon 04/14 10:48 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,18 Motion/Application to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal (wmim)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal - Including Amended Motion Mon 04/14 10:45 AM
Motion/Application to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal Filed by Plaintiff Irma C. Edmonds (wmim)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
17 17 audio Audio Docket Entry Mon 02/03 1:06 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 1/30/2025 11:06:36 AM ]. File Size [ 787 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:11 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 02, 2025
16 16 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 02/02 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
15 15 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 01/31 9:14 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (pdes)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
14 14 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 01/31 9:13 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] Status Conference Status Conference to be held on 4/24/2025 at 11:00 AM at Fresno Courtroom 11, Department A (pdes)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Matter Continued * Thu 01/30 3:55 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) : Complaint 24-01055 by Irma C. Edmonds against Valley Pacific Petroleum Services, Inc.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7429037) (wmim) [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 4/24/2025 at 11:00 AM at Fresno Courtroom 11, Department A (bsof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 01/28 5:45 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
11 11 reports Status Report Tue 01/28 5:43 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Irma C. Edmonds (tjof)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 08, 2024
10 10 utility Notice of Payment Due (Certificate) Sun 12/08 9:10 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Payment Due as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
9 9 order Defer Filing Fees (Links to Application to Defer Filing Fees) Fri 12/06 2:39 PM
Order granting8 Motion/Application to Defer Payment of Fee for Filing Complaint (hlum)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Defer Filing Fees Fri 12/06 2:38 PM
Motion/Application to Defer Payment of Fee for Filing Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Irma C. Edmonds (hlum)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Payment Due (A/R) - Including Amended Fri 12/06 1:02 AM
Notice of Payment Due in the amount of $350 RE: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) : Complaint 24-01055 by Irma C. Edmonds against Valley Pacific Petroleum Services, Inc.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7429037) (wmim) (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
6 6 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Tue 12/03 3:02 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet,4 Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program,5 Order to Confer (wmim)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Mon 12/02 3:07 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (wmim)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Mon 12/02 3:07 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (wmim)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 12/02 3:06 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference Status Conference to be held on 1/30/2025 at 11:00 AM at Fresno Courtroom 11, Department A (wmim)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Mon 12/02 3:06 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Mon 12/02 3:05 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) : Complaint 24-01055 by Irma C. Edmonds against Valley Pacific Petroleum Services, Inc.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7429037) (wmim)
Related: [-]