Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Jonker
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:24-cv-01276
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 4:47 AM EST
defendant
RSDC of Michigan, LLC
Represented By
Matthew M. O'Rourke
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Tristan Ridge
Represented By
Laura Supanich
Melmed Law Group
contact info
Jesse Lee Randolph Young
Sommers Schwartz Pc (kalamazoo)
contact info
Jonathan Melmed
Melmed Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
25 25 order Notice Rescheduling Hearing Wed 04/30 9:39 AM
NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 4/22/25: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/15/2025 at 03:00 PM in person at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker (sjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 04/23 1:15 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint16 with affirmative defenses by RSDC of Michigan, LLC (O'Rourke, Matthew)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Brief in Support of a Motion Wed 04/23 1:13 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim - Partial 22 filed by RSDC of Michigan, LLC (O'Rourke, Matthew)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Wed 04/23 1:11 PM
MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim - Partial by defendant RSDC of Michigan, LLC; (O'Rourke, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
21 21 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 04/18 12:42 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting (Joint Status Report) (Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
20 20 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 04/18 10:17 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice STIPULATION19 and dismissing as moot12 motion to dismiss; cancelling Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 4/22/25; parties to file joint status report no later than 4/25/25; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (sjc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
19 19 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Thu 04/17 11:35 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Stay Cause and to Toll the Statute of Limitations of Putative FLSA Collective Members by plaintiff Tristan Ridge (Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 04/04 3:41 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION17 to EXTEND TIME; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
17 17 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Thu 04/03 4:56 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant RSDC of Michigan, LLC (O'Rourke, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/20 11:55 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against RSDC of Michigan, LLC filed by Tristan Ridge (Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - CTJ Ridge
Thursday, March 13, 2025
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 03/13 2:04 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Paulina Rose Kennedy on behalf of plaintiff Tristan Ridge (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
15 15 5 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Tue 03/04 10:42 AM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 4/22/2025 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; joint status report due by 4/15/2015; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/28 3:23 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses by RSDC of Michigan, LLC (O'Rourke, Matthew)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Brief in Support of a Motion Fri 02/28 3:19 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss PARTIAL 12 filed by RSDC of Michigan, LLC (O'Rourke, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Aguilera v Michigan Turkey Opinion,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Martinez v Blue Star Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Dove v Corewell Order
12 12 motion Dismiss Fri 02/28 3:14 PM
MOTION to dismiss PARTIAL by defendant RSDC of Michigan, LLC; (O'Rourke, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 02/07 1:02 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME10 ; deadline extended to 2/28/2025; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
10 10 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Thu 02/06 8:44 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant RSDC of Michigan, LLC (O'Rourke, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 01/16 2:50 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME8 ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Thu 01/16 10:19 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant RSDC of Michigan, LLC (O'Rourke, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 12/26 12:01 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION6 to extend time for answer; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
6 6 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Mon 12/23 12:08 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant RSDC of Michigan, LLC [Attorney Matthew M. O'Rourke added to party RSDC of Michigan, LLC(pty:dft)] (O'Rourke, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/09 9:28 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; RSDC of Michigan, LLC served on 12/5/2024, answer due 12/26/2024 (Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 12/06 5:55 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Laura Supanich on behalf of plaintiff Tristan Ridge (Supanich, Laura)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 12/06 5:57 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jonathan Melmed on behalf of plaintiff Tristan Ridge (Melmed, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 12/04 11:00 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant RSDC of Michigan, LLC (eod)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Wed 12/04 10:58 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker (eod)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
2 2 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Tue 12/03 2:14 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 12/03 2:12 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against RSDC of Michigan, LLC filed by Tristan Ridge (Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Tue 12/03 2:13 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Tristan Ridge in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7556937 (Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]