Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Jennifer P Wilson
Case #: 1:24-cv-02081
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 5:09 AM EST
Defendant
Pyramid Construction Services, LLC
Represented By
Joseph Michael Kanfer
Woolford Kanfer Law, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Bircher
Represented By
Benjamin D. Salvina
Marzzacco Niven & Associates
contact info
Faith Fogle Pensinger
Marzzacco Niven & Assoc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 05/02 8:30 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph Michael Kanfer terminated. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/2/2025 (ve)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
19 19 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 05/01 12:53 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Pyramid Construction Services, LLC.(Kanfer, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 05/01 12:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Woolford on behalf of Pyramid Construction Services, LLC (Woolford, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
17 17 order Case Management Order - Standard Track Tue 03/18 12:07 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 3/18/2025. (ve)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
15 15 misc Case Management Plan Tue 03/11 12:08 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Pyramid Construction Services, LLC. (Kanfer, Joseph)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 03/11 8:59 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile document 14 using the following event: Civil Events - Other Filings -Other Documents-Includes Social Security Transcript and Brief Events -- Case Management Plan. (ibr)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 03/11 4:48 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Docket Entry 14 deleted and refiled by counsel as Docket Entry 15. (ibr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
14 14 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 03/10 2:16 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kanfer, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
13 13 misc Attorney Withdrawal of Appearance Wed 03/05 12:43 AM
WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Benjamin D. Salvina terminated on behalf of Daniel Bircher. (Salvina, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
12 12 misc Document Filed Thu 02/13 3:32 PM
Case Management Calendar. (ma)
Related: [-]
11 11 10 pgs order Order Thu 02/13 9:39 AM
CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 2/13/25. (ma)
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 02/13 9:38 AM
ORDER - A Case Management Conference has been set for 3/17/2025 at 2:15 PM before Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson. See order for call in information and other details. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 2/13/25. (ma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/11 11:50 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pyramid Construction Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Quandel Enterprises, LLC for Pyramid Construction Services, LLC.. (Kanfer, Joseph)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/11 10:47 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Pyramid Construction Services, LLC.(Kanfer, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 01/14 2:44 PM
ORDER re. Motions to Dismiss Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/14/25. (ma)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Letter Tue 01/14 2:44 PM
Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson (ma)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Fri 12/20 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Kanfer on behalf of Pyramid Construction Services, LLC (Kanfer, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/20 12:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Daniel Bircher. Pyramid Construction Services, LLC waiver sent on 12/13/2024, answer due 2/11/2025. (Salvina, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
3 3 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 12/04 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Faith Fogle Pensinger on behalf of Daniel Bircher (Pensinger, Faith)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 12/04 2:45 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case assigned to Judge Wilson. (aaa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 12/03 4:45 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ibr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/03 4:45 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6832523), filed by Daniel Bircher. (ibr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet