California Central District Court
Judge:Christina A Snyder
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:24-cv-10412
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Terminated:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 1:50 AM PST
Defendant
Certn (USA) Inc.
Represented By
Jasmine Jane Stanzick
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christian Allen Alvarado
Represented By
Jenna Dakroub
Consumer Justice Law Firm PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 21, 2025
17 17 order Dismissing Case Mon 02/24 10:49 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT CERTN (USA) INC. ONLY,16 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation is GRANTED. 23 The above-entitled matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to Defendant Ce1tn 24 (USA) Inc only Case Terminated. IT IS SO ORDERED. Made JS-6. (shb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
16 16 stip Dismiss Party Thu 02/20 7:41 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Certn (USA) Inc. filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado.(Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 01/17 11:28 AM
IN CHAMBERS - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT,14 Filed (01/09/2025) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: THE COURT, having been notified by counsel that the above-entitled action has been settled on or about January 9, 2025; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is hereby removed from this Court's active caseload until further application by the parties or order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file a proper stipulation for dismissal or a joint report detailing settlement status within 45 days and every quarter thereafter until a stipulation for dismissal is filed. The Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. All dates in this action are hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/09 1:42 PM
Notice filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado. Notice of Settlement (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
13 13 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Thu 01/02 8:19 AM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jenna Dakroub counsel for Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado. Changing Firm name to CONSUMER JUSTICE LAW FIRM PLC. Changing Email and fax number to E: jdakroub@consumerjustice.com; F: (480) 613-7733. Filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 12/30 9:49 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Certn (USA) Inc., identifying Certn Holdings Inc. (Stanzick, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 12/30 9:17 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Certn (USA) Inc. answer now due 1/24/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Certn (USA) Inc..(Attorney Jasmine Jane Stanzick added to party Certn (USA) Inc. (pty:dft))(Stanzick, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 12/23 9:58 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
9 9 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 12/19 2:24 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado, served on 12/13/2024. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Wed 12/18 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-10412 CAS(SSCx). (rn)
Related: [-]
7 7 textonly MJDAP Timely Opt-Out Wed 12/18 3:26 PM
Declination of Consent form received on 12/18/2024 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lkr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 12/05 4:00 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Certn (USA) Inc. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Thu 12/05 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 12/03 3:52 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado, (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 12/03 3:49 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 12/03 3:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 12/03 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38687628 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado. (Attorney Jenna Dakroub added to party Christian Allen Alvarado(pty:pla))(Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]