Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Alston
Case #: 2:24-bk-13083
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Trophy Cupcakes, LLC
13747 42nd Ave NE
Seattle, WA 98125-3887
Represented By
Faye C Rasch
Wenokur Riordan PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 6:04 PM PDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
151 151 misc BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 05/01 9:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 149 Trustee or UST Notice of Hearing mailed by BNC
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
150 150 misc Proof of Service Tue 04/29 1:52 PM
Proof of Service . Filed by Kevin D. O'Rourke Trustee on behalf of Kevin D. O'Rourke Trustee. Related [+]. (O'Rourke Trustee, Kevin)
Related: [-] 147 Motion for Compensation,148 Declaration,149 Trustee or UST Notice of Hearing mailed by BNC
149 149 trustee Trustee/UST Notice of Hearing (BNC) Tue 04/29 1:39 PM
Trustee or US Trustee's Notice of Hearing on First Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses of Kevin D. O'Rourke, Sub Chapter V Trustee Related [+]. Filed by Kevin D. O'Rourke Trustee on behalf of Kevin D. O'Rourke Trustee. (O'Rourke Trustee, Kevin)
Related: [-] 147 Motion for Compensation
148 148 ans Declaration Tue 04/29 1:31 PM
Declaration of Kevin D. O'Rourke in Support of First Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses of Sub Chapter V Trustee Related [+]... Filed by Kevin D. O'Rourke Trustee of Southwell & O'Rourke, P.S.-Trustee on behalf of Kevin D. O'Rourke Trustee. (O'Rourke Trustee, Kevin)
Related: [-] 147 Motion for Compensation
147 147 motion Compensation Tue 04/29 12:17 PM
First Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses .... Filed by Kevin D. O'Rourke Trustee on behalf of Kevin D. O'Rourke Trustee The Hearing date is set for 6/20/2025 at 09:30 AM at Judge Alston's Courtroom 7206, U.S. Courthouse. Response due by 6/13/2025. (O'Rourke Trustee, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 25, 2025
146 146 misc Operating Report Fri 04/25 1:28 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2025 . Filed by Faye C Rasch on behalf of Trophy Cupcakes LLC. (Rasch, Faye)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
145 145 misc BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 04/24 9:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 143 Notice of Entry of Confirmation of Plan